EP2992542 - OPERATING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A VEHICLE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/10] | CONTROL DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A VEHICLE COMPONENT | ||
[2016/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr-Hella Thermocontrol GmbH Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMMINGER, Egbert c/o Behr-Hella Thermocontrol GmbH Hansastraße 40 59557 Lippstadt / DE | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2017/11] |
Former [2016/10] | von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 14726543.3 | 30.04.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014EP58857 | Priority number, date | DE201310208088 | 02.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013208088 | [2016/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014177631 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2992542 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2992542 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/10, H01H9/16, H01H19/14, H01H3/08, B60K35/00, B60K37/06, B60H1/00, G05G1/08, G05G1/10, H01H19/02 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60H1/0065 (EP);
G05G1/08 (EP);
H01H19/025 (EP);
H01H19/14 (EP);
H01H3/08 (EP);
H01H3/10 (EP);
H01H9/161 (EP);
B60K2360/126 (EP);
B60K2360/33 (EP,US);
B60K2360/336 (EP,US);
B60K2360/34 (EP);
G05G1/105 (EP);
H01H2219/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | H01H3/08, H01H3/10, H01H9/16, H01H19/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENVORRICHTUNG INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGKOMPONENTE | [2016/10] | English: | OPERATING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A VEHICLE COMPONENT | [2016/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN SYSTÈME DE VÉHICULE | [2016/10] |
Former [2016/10] | CONTROL DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A VEHICLE COMPONENT | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 28.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2014 | AL | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | MT | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | IE | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | LU | 30.04.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102007057940 (PREH GMBH [DE]); | [A]JP2008282773 (DENSO CORP); | [A]DE112010005298T (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]); | [A]JP2013026028 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) | Examination | DE7308831U | by applicant | DE3335665 | DE3346243 | DE3427936 | DE4431281 | DE102007051716 |