EP3003384 - ORAL SOLUTION COMPRISING ATOMOXETINE HYDROCHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lamda Laboratories S.A. 59, Ioannou Metaxa Str. Karellas 19400 Koropi Attiki / GR | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARATZAS, Angelos Markou Botsari 15 GR-15235 Vrilissia Attica / GR | 02 /
STAPPA, Argyro Zoodochou Pigis 39A GR-15231 Chalandri Attica / GR | 03 /
KOTSIANIS, Ilias Tralleon 26 GR-14342 Nea Filadelfeia Attica / GR | 04 /
APOSTOLOU, Konstantinos Mavromichali 14 GR-15344 Gerakas Attica / GR | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Roukounas, Dimitrios Dietlindenstraße 18 80802 München / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14726544.1 | 02.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP59020 | Priority number, date | GR20140100157 | 24.03.2014 Original published format: GR 20140100157 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015144255 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003384 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003384 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/20, A61K47/22, A61K47/00, A61K47/26, A61K31/138, A61K9/00 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP,GR);
A61K31/135 (GR);
A61K31/138 (EP);
A61K47/20 (EP);
A61K47/22 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | A61K47/26, A61K9/08, A61K31/138 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORALE LÖSUNG MIT ATOMOXETIN-HYDROCHLORID | [2016/15] | English: | ORAL SOLUTION COMPRISING ATOMOXETINE HYDROCHLORIDE | [2016/15] | French: | SOLUTION ORALE CONTENANT DU CHLORHYDRATE D'ATOMOXÉTINE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 20.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 19.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2014 | AL | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | RS | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | LU | 02.05.2017 | MT | 02.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.05.2014 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 02.05.2014 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 02.05.2014 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.05.2014 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | HR | 26.10.2016 | |
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005152974 (BOEHM GARTH [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0244] - [0254] *; | [A]WO2006020348 (TEVA PHARM FINE CHEMICALS SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 12, lines 7-26 *; | [A]US2011076239 (REICHELT KATHARINA [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0052492 | - HUDA. . G ET AL., "Taste masked chewable dispersible tablet of atomoxetine HCI", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (2013), vol. 5, no. 1 | - Y. DEEPTHI PRIYA ET AL., "An approach for taste masking of bitter drug atomoxetine HCI", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADVANCES IN PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (201104), vol. 2, pages 4,119 - 121 |