EP3010701 - COMPONENT MADE OF A FIBER COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEITZ, Thomas Kaplaneigasse 29 FL-9493 Mauren / LI | 02 /
REGNER, Sebastian Linggstrasse 10 88138 Hergensweiler / DE | 03 /
SCHACHT, Arne An der Nafla 10 A-6800 Feldkirch / AT | [2017/51] |
Former [2016/17] | 01 /
HEITZ, Thomas Kaplaneigasse 29 FL-9493 Mauren / LI | ||
02 /
REGNER, Sebastian Oberreitnauerstr. 23 88131 Lindau / DE | |||
03 /
SCHACHT, Arne An der Nafla 10 A-6800 Feldkirch / AT | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2017/51] |
Former [2016/17] | ThyssenKrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14726570.6 | 22.05.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014EP60525 | Priority number, date | AT20130000504 | 20.06.2013 Original published format: AT 5042013 | DE20131014032 | 26.08.2013 Original published format: DE102013014032 | [2016/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014202325 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3010701 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3010701 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/30, B29C53/56, B29C33/48 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
B29C70/30 (EP,AT,US);
B62D1/16 (EP,AT,US);
B29C33/485 (EP,US);
B29C53/56 (AT);
B29C53/564 (EP,AT,US);
B29C70/16 (US);
B29C70/32 (US);
B29C70/345 (US);
B29C70/38 (EP,US);
B29C70/382 (US);
B29C70/48 (US);
B29C70/68 (EP,US);
B29C70/86 (AT,US);
B62D29/041 (AT);
B29C53/8066 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0058 (US);
B29K2105/089 (US);
B29K2105/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUTEIL AUS FASERVERBUNDWERKSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/17] | English: | COMPONENT MADE OF A FIBER COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2016/17] | French: | ÉLÉMENT EN COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ DE FIBRES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT ÉLÉMENT | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 14.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2014 | AL | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | MT | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | PT | 20.04.2018 | IE | 22.05.2018 | LU | 22.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2361753 (GKN AEROSPACE SERVICES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * abstract * [I] 3,4,6,8-10; | [A]DE102012005434 (THYSSENKRUPP PRESTA AG [LI]) [A] 1,2,5* the whole document * |