EP3004397 - USE OF URINARY HIV NUCLEIC ACIDS TO DIAGNOSE AND MONITOR HIV-ASSOCIATED NEPHROPATHY (HIVAN) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paris Descartes 12, rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states Assistance Publique-Hôpitaux de Paris (APHP) 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANAUD, Guillaume U1151 Inserm - Inem Batiment Leriche 96 Rue Didot CS61431 F-75993 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | 02 /
TERZI, Fabiola U1151 Inserm - Inem Batiment Leriche 96 Rue Didot CS61431 F-75993 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | 03 /
ROUZIOUX, Christine Paris Descartes EA 3620 Universite Paris Descartes CHU Necker 149 rue de Sèvres F-75015 Paris / FR | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Collin, Matthieu Inserm-Transfert Paris Biopark 7, rue Watt 75013 Paris / FR | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14726637.3 | 28.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP61108 | Priority number, date | EP20130305697 | 28.05.2013 Original published format: EP 13305697 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014191480 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004397 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/703 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HIV-HARNNUKLEINSÄUREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND ÜBERWACHUNG HIV-ASSOZIIERTER NEPHROPATHIE (HIVAN) | [2016/15] | English: | USE OF URINARY HIV NUCLEIC ACIDS TO DIAGNOSE AND MONITOR HIV-ASSOCIATED NEPHROPATHY (HIVAN) | [2016/15] | French: | UTILISATION DES ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES DU VIH DANS L'URINE POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER ET SURVEILLER UNE NÉPHROPATHIE ASSOCIÉE AU VIH (HIVAN) | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2012208175 (NEWMAN GALE W [US], et al) [I] 1-9,11,13-15,17 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0046] , [0060] , [0064] * * figure 1 * [Y] 10,16; | [A]WO2009126517 (INTELLIGENT MEDICAL DEVICES IN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 28-30 *; | [A]US2012083421 (BARASCH JONATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 1, 6, 7, 9 * * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [0 25]; example 1 * | [XDAY] - CHRISTINA M. WYATT ET AL, "Recent Progress in HIV-Associated Nephropathy", ANNUAL REVIEW OF MEDICINE, (20120218), vol. 63, no. 1, doi:10.1146/annurev-med-041610-134224, ISSN 0066-4219, pages 147 - 159, XP055072289 [XD] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-9,11,13-15,17 [Y] 10,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-med-041610-134224 | [IA] - MICHELLE ESTRELLA ET AL, "HIV Type 1 RNA Level as a Clinical Indicator of Renal Pathology in HIV-Infected Patients", CLINICAL INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (20060801), vol. 43, no. 3, doi:10.1086/505497, ISSN 1058-4838, pages 377 - 380, XP055072294 [I] 14 * the whole document * [A] 1-13,15-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/505497 | [A] - KHATUA A K ET AL, "Non-productive HIV-1 infection of human glomerular and urinary podocytes", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 408, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2010.09.005, ISSN 0042-6822, (20101205), pages 119 - 127, (20101026), XP027445977 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2010.09.005 | by applicant | - ADIH, W.K.; SELIK, R.M.; HU, X., "Trends in Diseases Reported on US Death Certificates That Mentioned HIV Infection, 1996-2006", J INT ASSOC PHYSICIANS AIDS CARE (CHIC, (2011), vol. 10, pages 5 - 11 | - AVETTAND-FENOEL, V. ET AL., "HIV-DNA in rectal cells is well correlated with HIV-DNA in blood in different groups of patients, including long-term non-progressors", AIDS (LONDON, ENGLAND, (2008), vol. 22, pages 1880 - 1882 | - AVETTAND-FENOEL, V. ET AL., "LTR real-time PCR for HIV- DNA quantitation in blood cells for early diagnosis in infants born to seropositive mothers treated in HAART area (ANRS CO 01", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL VIROLOGY, (2009), vol. 81, pages 217 - 223 | - CANAUD, G. ET AL., "Intensive and prolonged treatment of focal and segmental glomerulosclerosis recurrence in adult kidney transplant recipients: a pilot study", AM J TRANSPLANT, (2009), vol. 9, pages 1081 - 1086 | - CHEN, P. ET AL., "Virological synapses allow HIV- uptake and gene expression in renal tubular epithelial cells", J AM SOC NEPHROL, (2011), vol. 22, pages 496 - 507 | - COHEN, M.S.; SHAW, G.M.; MCMICHAEL, A.J.; HAYNES, B.F., "Acute HIV-1 Infection", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2011), vol. 364, pages 1943 - 1954 | - HIRSCH, V.M. ET AL., "Induction of AIDS by simian immunodeficiency virus from an African green monkey: species-specific variation in pathogenicity correlates with the extent of in vivo replication", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 69, pages 955 - 967 | - KUMAR, M.S. ET AL., "Safety and success of kidney transplantation and concomitant immunosuppression in HIV-positive patients", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (2005), vol. 67, pages 1622 - 1629, XP055072213 | - MARRAS, D. ET AL., "Replication and compartmentalization of HIV- in kidneyepithelium of patients with HIV-associated nephropathy", NATURE MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 8, pages 522 - 526 | - MOLLET, G. ET AL., "Podocin inactivation in mature kidneys causes focal segmental glomerulosclerosis and nephrotic syndrome", J AM SOC NEPHROL, (2009), vol. 20, pages 2181 - 2189 | - NETTLES, R.E. ET AL., "Intermittent HIV-1 viremia (Blips) and drug resistance in patients receiving HAART", JAMA : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, (2005), vol. 293, pages 817 - 829 | - "Solid organ transplantation in the HIV-infected patient", AM J TRANSPLANT, (2004), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 83 - 88 | - STEVENS, L.A.; LEVEY, A.S, "Measured GFR as a confirmatory test for estimated GFR", J AM SOC NEPHROL, (2009), vol. 20, pages 2305 - 2313 | - STOCK, P.G. ET AL., "Outcomes of kidney transplantation in HIV-infected recipients", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2010), vol. 363, pages 2004 - 2014 | - STRAUSS, J. ET AL., "Renal disease in children with the acquired immunodeficiency syndrome", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1989), vol. 321, pages 625 - 630 | - TOUZOT, M. ET AL., "Renal transplantation in HIV-infected patients: the Paris experience", AM J TRANSPLANT, (2010), vol. 10, pages 2263 - 2269 | - WYATT, C.M.; MELIAMBRO, K.; KLOTMAN, P.E., "Recent progress in HIV-associated nephropathy", ANNUAL REVIEW OF MEDICINE, (2012), vol. 63, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev-med-041610-134224, pages 147 - 159, XP055072289 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-med-041610-134224 | - ZHANG, L. ET AL., "Quantifying residual HIV-1 replication in patients receivingcombination antiretroviral therapy", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1999), vol. 340, pages 1605 - 1613 |