01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
01.03.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
15.06.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
23.03.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.02.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.02.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.09.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.09.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
21.07.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
16.06.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.05.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
04.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.06.2016 |
First examination report |
|
06.05.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
22.04.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
11.12.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
11.12.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
26.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
17.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|