EP2965090 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Randox Teoranta Meenmore Dungloe, Co. Donegal / IE | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Randox Teoranta Randox Teoranta Meenmore Dungloe, Co. Donegal Dungloe / IE | ||
Former [2016/02] | For all designated states Randox Teoranta Meenmore Dungloe, Co. Donegal / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FITZGERALD, Peter Randox Laboratories Ltd. 55 Diamond Road Crumlin Antrim BT29 4QY / GB | 02 /
MCCONNELL, Ivan Randox Laboratories Ltd 55 Diamond Road Crumlin Antrim BT29 4QY / GB | 03 /
LAMONT, John Randox Laboratories Ltd. 55 Diamond Road Crumlin Antrim BT29 4QY / GB | 04 /
RICHARDSON, Ciaran Randox Teoranta Meenmore Dungloe Dungloe Co. Donegal / IE | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/17] |
Former [2016/02] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 14726887.4 | 04.03.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014EP54185 | Priority number, date | GB20130003936 | 05.03.2013 Original published format: GB 201303936 | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014135546 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2965090 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2965090 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,GB,US);
C07K14/4711 (GB);
C12Q1/6883 (GB,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US);
G16B40/20 (EP,GB,US);
C12Q2600/112 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
G01N2333/47 (US);
G01N2333/4716 (US);
G01N2333/76 (EP,US);
G01N2333/775 (US);
G01N2333/81 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE DIAGNOSE VON ALZHEIMERSKRANKHEIT | [2017/43] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [2016/02] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [2016/02] |
Former [2016/02] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2014 | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.03.2014 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006134390 (RANDOX LAB LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2007099203 (ZHANG JING [US]) [X] 14-17 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 27] , [0 46] , [0 61] - [0064] - [0 76] , [0 80] , [ 131] , [ 145]; figures 5-7; examples 1-17, 40, 42 * [Y] 1-13; | [AP]EP2664923 (FOND ITALIANA SCLEROSI MULTIPLA FISM ONLUS [IT], et al) [AP] 1-17* the whole document *; | [XY] - JERKOVIC L ET AL, "Afamin is a novel human vitamin E-binding glycoprotein characterization and in vitro expression", JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050501), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1021/PR0500105, ISSN 1535-3907, pages 889 - 899, XP002371055 [X] 14-16 * page 892, column 1, lines 10-39 * * page 892, column 2, lines 43-46 * [Y] 1-13,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/pr0500105 | [Y] - ZHANG JING ET AL, "QUANTITATIVE PROTEOMICS OF CEREBROSPINAL FLUID FROM PATIENTS WITH ALZHEIMER DISEASE", JOURNAL OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, IOS PRESS, NL, (20050401), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1387-2877, page 125, XP009076593 [Y] 1-17 * page 132, column 2, lines 26-37 * | [Y] - SONG F ET AL, "Screening plasma for biomarkers of mild cognitive impairment and Alzheimer's disease by quantitative proteomic methods", ALZHEIMER'S & DEMENTIA: THE JOURNAL OF THE ALZHEIMER'SASSOCIATION, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JALZ.2010.05.406, ISSN 1552-5260, (20100701), pages S129 - S130, (20100701), XP027438934 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jalz.2010.05.406 | [Y] - John M Ringman ET AL, "Proteomic changes in cerebrospinal fluid of presymptomatic and affected persons carrying familial Alzheimer disease mutations", Archives of neurology, United States, doi:10.1001/archneurol.2011.642, (20120101), pages 96 - 104, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/22232349, XP055134102 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archneurol.2011.642 | [Y] - PETRA ZÜRBIG ET AL, "Use of proteomic methods in the analysis of human body fluids in Alzheimer research", ELECTROPHORESIS, (20121219), vol. 33, no. 24, doi:10.1002/elps.201200360, ISSN 0173-0835, pages 3617 - 3630, XP055134112 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.201200360 |