EP3004232 - DIALKYL 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLATE PLASTICIZERS AND PLASTICIZED POLYMERIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAUDHARY, Bharat I. 14 Michelle Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/14] |
Former [2016/15] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14727367.6 | 12.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US37624 | Priority number, date | US201361828222P | 29.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361828222 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014193635 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004232 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3004232 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/68, C08L91/00, H01B3/44, C08K5/1515, C08K5/1535, C07D303/02, C08K5/00, C08L27/06, C07D303/48 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
C09D127/06 (US);
C07D303/48 (EP,US);
C08K5/1515 (EP,US);
C08K5/1535 (EP,US);
C08L27/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/1515, C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/1535, C08L27/06 (US,EP);
C08L27/06, C08K5/1535, C08L91/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | C08K5/1515, C08K5/1535, C08L27/06, C07D303/02, C07D307/68, C08K5/00, H01B3/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIALKYL-2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLATWEICHMACHER UND WEICHE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2016/15] | English: | DIALKYL 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLATE PLASTICIZERS AND PLASTICIZED POLYMERIC COMPOSITIONS | [2016/15] | French: | PLASTIFIANTS À BASE DE DIALKYLE 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLATE ET COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES PLASTIFIÉES | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 25.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2012202725 (GRASS MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0086] * * table 2 *; | [X]WO2012113607 (EVONIK OXENO GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 3, line 30 - line 31 * * page 4, line 1 - line 4 * * page 19, line 12 - line 14 * * table 1 * * claim - *; | [A]WO2013055961 (GALATA CHEMICALS LLC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2013184661 (STICHTING DIENST LANDBOUWKUNDI [NL], et al) [XP] 1-10* example 5 * | by applicant | US5246783 | US6496629 | US6714707 |