23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
18.09.2020 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
11.09.2020 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
17.06.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
10.06.2020 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
08.06.2020 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
24.03.2020 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
20.03.2020 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
20.03.2020 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
05.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
05.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
18.07.2018 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
14.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Opposition filed |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
28.04.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
24.04.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.04.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.04.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
10.07.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
02.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
08.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|