Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9718321 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2017 | B2 | US2016221603 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61303 | 02.06.2014 | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104884281B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2017 | B | CN104884281 | 02.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61303 | 02.06.2014 | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014273044B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2016 | B2 | AU2014273044 | 21.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61303 | 02.06.2014 | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2903838 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2020 | B2 | EP2903838 | 31.05.2017 | B1 | EP2903838 | 12.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61303 | 02.06.2014 | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015011166 | 11.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61303 | 02.06.2014 | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2903838T | 31.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61303 | 02.06.2014 | EP14727505 | 02.06.2014 | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2597435 | 10.09.2016 | C1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61303 | 02.06.2014 | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014191570 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013210142 | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013210142 | 31.05.2013 |