EP3004418 - CORE-SHELL TYPE ANODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES, METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Viale Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COJOCARU, Paula 13 Via Sanzio I-20025 Legnano (MI) / IT | 02 /
APOSTOLO, Marco 16 Via XXIV Maggio I-20030 Senago (MI) / IT | 03 /
FOUDA-ONANA, Frederic 20 Rue Casimir Brenier F-38120 St-Egrève / FR | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 14727563.0 | 03.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP61504 | Priority number, date | EP20130170517 | 04.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13170517 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014195324 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3004418 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/16, C23C18/31, C23C18/40, H01M4/134, H01M4/1395, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M4/02, C23C18/18 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
C23C18/1635 (EP,US);
C23C18/1879 (EP,US);
C23C18/405 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (US);
H01M4/0404 (US);
H01M4/0409 (US);
H01M4/049 (US);
H01M4/133 (US);
H01M4/134 (EP,US);
H01M4/1393 (US);
H01M4/1395 (EP,US);
H01M4/364 (EP,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M4/602 (US);
H01M4/622 (EP,US);
H01M4/626 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | KERN/HÜLLEN-ANODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN DAMIT | [2016/15] | English: | CORE-SHELL TYPE ANODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES, METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES CONTAINING THE SAME | [2016/15] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ANODE DE TYPE NOYAU-COQUE POUR BATTERIES SECONDAIRES AU LITHIUM, PROCÉDÉ POUR LE PRÉPARER ET BATTERIES SECONDAIRES AU LITHIUM LE CONTENANT | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 15.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1566855 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0151] *; | [A]US2007048609 (UEDA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,14-16 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] ** paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0111] *; | [A]US2007092796 (MATSUDA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,14-16 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]US2010092868 (KIM HYUNG-SUN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] *; | [Y]US2012007028 (HWANG SUN JUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0068] *; | [A]US2012088155 (YUSHIN GLEB [US], et al) [A] 1-7,14-16 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0098] *; | [Y]US2012094178 (LOVERIDGE MELANIE J [GB], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0149] *; | [AP]EP2690689 (UMICORE NV [BE], et al) [AP] 1-7,14-16 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *; | [AP]CN103779536 (NANJING AMPRIUS CO LTD) [AP] 1-7,14-16 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] *; | [A] - KIM ET AL, "Improvement of silicon powder negative electrodes by copper electroless deposition for lithium secondary batteries", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, (20050909), vol. 147, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2004.12.041, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 227 - 233, XP005039649 [A] 1,8-16 * 2. Experimental; page 228 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2004.12.041 | [A] - HIROYUKI USUI ET AL, "Influence of order in stepwise electroless deposition on anode properties of thick-film electrodes consisting of Si particles coated with Ni and Cu", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 196, no. 23, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2011.08.018, ISSN 0378-7753, (20110804), pages 10244 - 10248, (20110810), XP028303459 [A] 1,8-13 * 2 Experimental; page 10245 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2011.08.018 | by applicant | US2006147790 | US2010304270 | US2011244322 | KR101105877B | EP2450988 | US2012202112 | WO2013037692 | - XING, WEIBING ET AL., "Pyrolyzed Polysiloxanes for Use as Anode Materials in Lithium-Ion Batteries", J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 144, no. 7, pages 2410 - 2416 | - QI, YUE ET AL., "CoO/NiSix core-shell nanowire arrays as lithium-ion anodes with high rate capabilities", NANOSCALE, (2012), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 991 - 996 |