EP3004606 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR WARMING A CATALYST IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Naoya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyotacho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
UCHIDA, Daisuke c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyotacho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2017/11] |
Former [2016/15] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14727629.9 | 24.04.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP02316 | Priority number, date | JP20130118766 | 05.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013118766 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014196122 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004606 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3004606 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F02D41/14, F02D41/30, F02D37/02, F01N3/30, F01N9/00, F01N11/00, F01N3/20, F01N3/22, F02D41/04, F02D41/38, F02D41/40, F02B17/00, F02B23/10, F02D41/06, F02P5/15 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
F02D41/0245 (EP,US);
F01N3/2006 (US);
F01N3/225 (EP,US);
F01N3/30 (EP,US);
F01N9/00 (US);
F02D37/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/025 (EP,US);
F02D41/0255 (EP,US);
F02D41/04 (US);
F02D41/1446 (US);
F02D41/3023 (EP,US);
F02D41/3076 (US);
F02D41/38 (US);
F02P5/045 (EP,US);
F02P5/1506 (EP,US);
F01N11/002 (US);
F01N2430/06 (EP,US);
F01N2430/08 (EP,US);
F01N2550/14 (EP,US);
F01N2560/06 (US);
F01N2610/06 (US);
F01N2900/08 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1404 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1602 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1626 (EP,US);
F02B17/005 (EP,US);
F02B23/105 (EP,US);
F02D2041/389 (US);
F02D2200/021 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0802 (EP,US);
F02D41/064 (EP,US);
F02D41/3029 (US);
F02D41/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | F02D41/02, F02D41/14, F02D41/30, F02D37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HEIZEN EINES KATALYSATORS IN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2016/37] | English: | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR WARMING A CATALYST IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2016/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CHAUFFAGE DU CATALYSEUR DANS UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2016/30] |
Former [2016/15] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERWÄRMEN EINES KATALYSATORS IN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | ||
Former [2016/15] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RÉCHAUFFER UN CATALYSEUR DANS UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 24.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2014 | AL | 15.03.2017 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | IE | 24.04.2017 | LU | 24.04.2017 | MT | 24.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0943793 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] *; | [A]JP2000054881 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000080947 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000120471 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001304016 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP2075449 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] *; | [A]EP2116712 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] *; | [A]DE102010061804 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] *; | [A]US2012222408 (GONZE EUGENE V [US], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0008] * | by applicant | JPH0579323 | JPH11324765 | JP2003056392 | JP2008208765 | JP2010112289 | JP2011111895 |