EP2970921 - HISTIDYL-TRNA SYNTHETASE-FC CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states aTyr Pharma, Inc. 3545 John Hopkins Court, Suite 250 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUECHLER, Ying 1343 Cassins Street Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | 02 /
CHIANG, Kyle 1615 Debann Road Cardiff, CA 92007 / US | 03 /
DO, Minh-Ha 3911 Zanako Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
LEE, Darin 3432 Conrad Avenue San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 05 /
PIEHL, Kristi 5321 Zion Avenue San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 06 /
THOMAS, Marc 800 Orca Avo Drive Vista, CA 92084-0282 / US | 07 /
WATKINS, Jeffry, D 3442 Fortuna Ranch Road Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 08 /
WU, Chi-Fang 2649 Villas Way San Diego, CA 92108 / US | 09 /
MENDLEIN, John, D. 1550 Neptune Avenue Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2018/38] |
Former [2016/03] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 14727652.1 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US29699 | Priority number, date | US201361789011P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361789011 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014145050 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970921 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2970921 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/00, C12N9/96, A61P21/00, A61P29/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/96 (EP,US);
C12Y601/01021 (US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 15.10.2015 | ME | 15.10.2015 | Title | German: | HISTIDYL-TRNA-SYNTHETASE-FC-KONJUGATE | [2016/03] | English: | HISTIDYL-TRNA SYNTHETASE-FC CONJUGATES | [2016/03] | French: | CONJUGUÉS HISTIDYL-ARNT SYNTHÉTASE-RÉGION FC | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 15.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18194251.7 / EP3460054 | EP20202708.2 Application withdrawn : 02.02.2021 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 19.09.2018 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | IE | 14.03.2019 | LU | 14.03.2019 | MT | 14.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2010107825 (PANGU BIOPHARMA LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-12,14-24,41-48,52-69,71,72,76,77,82-84 * pages 1-9,32,; claim - * * the whole document * [Y] 1-81; | [XY]WO2011072265 (ATYR PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,14-24,41-48,52-69,71,72,76,77,82-84 * pages 4,37-38; claim -; sequence 28 * * pages 64-65 * [Y] 1-81; | [XPI]WO2013123432 (ATYR PHARMA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,63,65,71-86 * the whole document * * pages 87,97; claim - * * page 115 * [I] 2-62,64,66-70; | [XDPI]US2014066321 (XU ZHIWEN [CN], et al) [XDP] 1,63,65,71-77,81-84 * the whole document * [I] 2-62,64,66-70,78-80,85,86; | [Y] - PAUL J CARTER, "Introduction to current and future protein therapeutics: A protein engineering perspective", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 317, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.YEXCR.2011.02.013, ISSN 0014-4827, (20110224), pages 1261 - 1269, (20110301), XP028205664 [Y] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2011.02.013 | [Y] - HUANG ET AL, "Receptor-Fc fusion therapeutics, traps, and MIMETIBODY technology", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 20, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.COPBIO.2009.10.010, ISSN 0958-1669, (20091104), pages 692 - 699, (20091104), XP026778880 [Y] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2009.10.010 | [Y] - A. HÄUSSERMANN ET AL, "Das Anti-Jo-1-Syndrom - eine Sonderform der Myositis mit interstitieller Lungenerkrankung", PNEUMOLOGIE, (20100412), vol. 64, no. 08, doi:10.1055/s-0029-1244054, ISSN 0934-8387, pages 496 - 503, XP055131699 [Y] 69-81 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0029-1244054 | [Y] - LEVINE STUART M ET AL, "Anti-aminoacyl tRNA synthetase immune responses: Insights into the pathogenesis of the idiopathic inflammatory myopathies", CURRENT OPINION IN RHEUMATOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, (20031101), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 1040-8711, pages 708 - 713, XP009145406 [Y] 69-81 * the whole document * | [A] - GUZZO ET AL, "Systematic analysis of fusion and affinity tags using human aspartyl-tRNA synthetase expressed in E. coli", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, (20070426), vol. 54, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.PEP.2007.03.001, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 166 - 175, XP022056649 [A] 1-86 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2007.03.001 | Examination | US2011086058 | by applicant | US3773919 | US4326053 | US4326052 | US4751180 | US4861760 | US4873192 | US4888354 | US4935233 | US5116964 | US5420109 | US5428130 | US5455165 | US5466468 | US5514582 | US5624821 | US5725871 | US5756353 | US5780045 | US5804212 | WO0042072 | US6291212 | US6300099 | US6406697 | US2003118592 | US2003190311 | WO2004016750 | WO2005047337 | US2005255144 | US7029872 | US7030226 | US2006173170 | US2006269553 | US2007092940 | US2007092521 | US7217797 | US2007111281 | US7230068 | US2007148170 | US2007224188 | US2007253966 | US2007269369 | US7326681 | US2008206246 | US7425619 | WO2008147143 | US2009010921 | US2009017023 | US2009163699 | US7629163 | US7632924 | US7638299 | US7662925 | US2010080794 | US2010092997 | US7700321 | US7732570 | US2010143254 | US7737226 | US7736872 | US2010184959 | US2010203046 | US2010209424 | US2010249382 | US2010255013 | US7816320 | US7820766 | US7829310 | US7838265 | US7883866 | US7939496 | US7947473 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, (2000), vol. I-II | - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach | - Peptide and protein PEGylation, Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (2002), vol. 54, pages 453 - 609 | - ZALIPSKY, S. ET AL., "Use of functionalized Poly(Ethylene Glycols) for modification of polypeptides", POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL CHEMISTRY: BIOTECHNICAL AND BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS | - DEVERAUX ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, page 3389 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453 | - E. MEYERS; W. MILLER, CABIOS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL, (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - KUNKEL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1985), vol. 82, pages 488 - 492 | - KUNKEL ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL, (1987), vol. 154, pages 367 - 382 | - "A model of evolutionary change in proteins", DAYHOFF ET AL., Matrices for determining distance relationships, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, (1978), vol. 5, pages 345 - 358 | - GONNET ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 14430 - 1445 | - XU ET AL., STRUCTURE, (2012), vol. 20, pages 1470 - 7 | - ZAIWARA ET AL., MOL BIOTECHNOL., (2012), vol. 51, pages 67 - 102 | - PERONA; HADD, BIOCHEMISTRY, (2012), vol. 51, pages 8705 - 29 | - MORIN ET AL., TRENDS BIOTECHOL., (2011), vol. 29, pages 159 - 66 | - COLLINS ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOPHYS., (2011), vol. 40, pages 81 - 98 | - WITTMANN ET AL., J VIS EXP., (2012), vol. 65, page E4203 | - FELDMAN ET AL., MOL CELL, (2012), vol. 47, pages 585 - 95 | - CLUTTERBUCK ET AL., J PROTEOMICS, (2011), vol. 74, pages 704 - 15 | - GIDDINGS; MAITRA, J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2010), vol. 15, pages 1204 - 10 | - WIJNHOVEN ET AL., GLYCOCONJ J., (2008), vol. 25, pages 177 - 85 | - FROW ET AL., MED RES REV., (2004), vol. 24, pages 276 - 98 | - ROBERTS; VELLACCIO, The Peptides: Analysis, Synthesis, Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1983), vol. 5, page 341 | - Combinatorial Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS INC., (1997), page 235 | - Burger's Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, JOHN WILEY & SONS INC., (1995), pages 619 - 620 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., NUC. ACID. RES., (2000), vol. 28, page 292 | - KAMEDA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2006), vol. 349, pages 1269 - 1277 | - ZUKER M., NUCL. ACID RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 3406 - 3415 | - MANTYH ET AL., PNAS, (1995), vol. 92, pages 2662 - 2666 | - MANTYH ET AL., PROTO EXP. & PURIF., (1995), vol. 6, page 124 | - MERRIFIELD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2154 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1869 | - MATTHES ET AL., EMBO JOURNAL, (1984), vol. 3, pages 801 - 805 | - STRUCTURAL GENOMICS CONSORTIUM ET AL., NATURE METHODS, (2008), vol. 5, pages 135 - 146 | - SHIMP ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR PURIF., (2006), vol. 50, pages 58 - 67 | - QING ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 22, pages 877 - 882 | - GRANT ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, pages 516 - 544 | - LI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 24, pages 210 - 215 | - HAMILTON ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 301, page 1244 | - HAMILTON ET AL., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 313, pages 1441 - 1443 | - WILDT ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS MICROBIOL., (2005), vol. 3, pages 119 - 28 | - GERNGROSS ET AL., NATURE-BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 22, pages 1409 - 1414 | - TAKAMATSU, EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 307 - 311 | - CORUZZI ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 1671 - 1680 | - BROGLIE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 224, pages 838 - 843 | - WINTER ET AL., RESULTS PROBL. CELL DIFFER., (1991), vol. 17, pages 85 - 105 | - HOBBS, Yearbook of Science and Technology, MCGRAW HILL, (1992), pages 191 - 196 | - ENGELHARD ET AL., PNAS USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3224 - 3227 | - LOGAN; SHENK, PNAS USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 3655 - 3659 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., ANNALS NY. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - URLAUB ET AL., PNAS USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - YAZAKI; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 255 - 268 | - SHIN ET AL., INTERN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 10, pages 177 - 186 | - UMANA ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 176 - 180 | - DAVIES ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG., (2001), vol. 74, pages 288 - 294 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 26733 - 26740 | - SHINKAWA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 3466 - 3473 | - SHIELDS ET AL., JBIOL CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604 | - PRESTA ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC TRANS., (2002), vol. 30, pages 487 - 490 | - ZUCKERMAN ET AL., CRC CRIT REV MICROBIOL., (1978), vol. 7, pages 1 - 26 | - CLYNES ET AL., PNAS, (1998), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - GEORGE; HERINGA, J PROTEIN ENG., (2002), vol. 15, pages 871 - 879 | - MARATEA ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 40, pages 39 - 46 | - MURPHY ET AL., PNAS USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 8258 - 8262 | - LIU ET AL., PNAS, (1997), vol. 94, pages 5525 - 5530 | - KIM ET AL., PNAS, (1996), vol. 93, pages 1156 - 1160 | - CHAUDHARY ET AL., PNAS, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1066 - 1070 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - DESJARLAIS; BERG, PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 2256 - 2260 | - PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 11099 - 11103 | - DONNELLY ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (2001), vol. 82, pages 1027 - 1041 | - DONNELLY ET AL., JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (2001), vol. 82, pages 1027 - 1041 | - RYAN ET AL., J. GENER. VIROL., (1997), vol. 78, pages 699 - 722 | - SCYMCZAK ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2004), vol. 5, pages 589 - 594 | - MILLER, LM, PATHOLOGY LECTURE NOTES | - PUFFENBERGER ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 1, page E28936 | - PIERCE ET AL., PNAS USA, (2011), vol. 108, no. 16, pages 6543 - 6548 | - HOFFMAN AS, ANN. NY. ACAD. SCI., (2001), vol. 944, pages 62 - 73 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, pages 1035 - 1038,157 | - FINNIN; MORGAN, J. PHARM. SCI., (1999), vol. 88, no. 10, pages 955 - 958 | - FICHTNER-FEIGL ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2005), vol. 115, pages 3057 - 3071 |