EP3025223 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOTE-CONTROLLING A FUNCTION OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNET, Christophe Albstrasse 11 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 02 /
HILLER, Andreas Paradiesstrasse 111 70563 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
KUENZEL, Gerhard Trollinger-Strasse 12 71726 Benningen / DE | 04 /
MOSER, Martin Bosslerstrasse 26 70736 Fellbach / DE | 05 /
SCHIEMENZ, Heiko Böhmstrasse 5 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 14727709.9 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014EP01374 | Priority number, date | DE20131012394 | 26.07.2013 Original published format: DE102013012394 | [2016/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015010752 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3025223 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/01, B60R25/00, B60W30/06, B60W50/00 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60K35/60 (EP);
B60R25/2045 (EP,US);
B60W30/06 (EP,US);
B60W50/10 (EP);
G05D1/0011 (US);
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1464 (EP);
B60K2360/797 (EP);
B60W2050/0064 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FERNSTEUERUNG EINER FUNKTION EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2016/22] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOTE-CONTROLLING A FUNCTION OF A VEHICLE | [2016/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE À DISTANCE D'UNE FONCTION D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2007037806 (APPLE COMPUTER [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0015]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027]; figures 6-9 * [A] 8-10; | [IY]DE102008051982 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [I] 8-10 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 32]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0058]; figure 14 * [Y] 1-7; | [A]DE102012008858 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6* paragraph [0039] * | by applicant | EP1249379 | DE102004004302 | DE112006003515T | DE102009019910 | DE102009041587 |