EP3003027 - WATER SOLUBLE POLYMERS FOR AGROCHEMICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lamberti SpA Ufficio Brevetti via Piave 18 21041 Albizzate / IT | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAGLIA, Filippo Via Giacomo Matteotti 23 I-20026 Novate Milanese (MI) / IT | 02 /
FORNARA, Dario Via Conti di Biandrate 11D I-28100 Novara / IT | 03 /
DI MODUGNO, Rocco 18 Mystic Glade Spring, TEXAS 77382 / US | 04 /
PICCO, Cristina Via della Costituzione 83 I-28047 Oleggio (NO) / IT | 05 /
D'ALOIA, Alessandro Via Crosa della Maccarina 16/A I-15067 Novi Ligure (AL) / IT | 06 /
BENETTI, Arianna Via Carlo Gazzulli 24 I-21018 Sesto Calende (VA) / IT | 07 /
FLORIDI, Giovanni Via Regaldi 2c I-28100 Novara / IT | 08 /
LI BASSI, Giuseppe Via Stretti 4 I-21026 Gavirate (VA) / IT | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Giaroni, Paola LAMBERTI S.p.A. Ufficio Brevetti Via Piave, 18 21041 Albizzate (VA) / IT | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14728857.5 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP60485 | Priority number, date | IT2013VA00029 | 27.05.2013 Original published format: IT VA20130029 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014191288 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003027 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003027 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/04, C08F8/14 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A01N25/04 (EP,MX,RU,US);
A01N25/30 (EP,MX,US);
A01N37/18 (EP,US);
A01N37/34 (US);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (US);
A01N43/42 (EP,US);
A01N43/50 (US);
A01N43/54 (US);
A01N43/58 (US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N43/707 (EP,US);
C08F22/02 (US);
C08F8/14 (RU);
C08F120/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/04, A01N37/18, A01N37/34, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/42, A01N43/54, A01N43/58, A01N43/653, A01N43/707, A01N51/00 (US,EP);
A01N25/30, A01N37/18, A01N37/34, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/42, A01N43/54, A01N43/58, A01N43/653, A01N43/707, A01N51/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/18, A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/36, A01N51/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/42, A01N43/58 (US,EP);
A01N43/653, A01N43/36, A01N51/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSLICHE POLYMERE FÜR AGROCHEMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2016/15] | English: | WATER SOLUBLE POLYMERS FOR AGROCHEMICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2016/15] | French: | POLYMÈRES HYDROSOLUBLES DESTINÉS À DES COMPOSITIONS AGROCHIMIQUES | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | MT | 12.09.2018 | RS | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | SM | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | IE | 21.05.2019 | LU | 21.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
MT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/27] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0633057 (RHONE POULENC GERONAZZO SPA [IT]); | [XY]FR2925365 (COATEX S A S SOC PAR ACTIONS S [FR]) | by applicant | US5139773 | US5320672 | US6093764 | US6767865 | US2006142159 | WO2008015185 | WO2010121976 |