EP3011389 - SCANNING COHERENT DIFFRACTIVE IMAGING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ACTINIC MASK INSPECTION FOR EUV LITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Scherrer Institut 5232 Villigen PSI / CH | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EKINCI, Yasin Dora-Staudinger 6 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2016/17] | Application number, filing date | 14729248.6 | 26.05.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014EP60834 | Priority number, date | EP20130172238 | 17.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13172238 | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014202341 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3011389 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00, G03F1/84 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
G03F1/84 (EP,US);
G03F1/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | ABTASTUNGSKOHÄRENTES DIFFRAKTIVES BILDGEBUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AKTINISCHEN MASKENINSPEKTION FÜR DIE EUV-LITHOGRAFIE | [2016/17] | English: | SCANNING COHERENT DIFFRACTIVE IMAGING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ACTINIC MASK INSPECTION FOR EUV LITHOGRAPHY | [2016/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE DIFFRACTIVE COHÉRENTE À BALAYAGE ET SYSTÈME POUR L'INSPECTION DE MASQUE ACTINIQUE POUR LA LITHOGRAPHIE À UVE | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP] - LEE SANGSUL ET AL, "A novel concept for actinic EUV mask review tool using a scanning lensless imaging method at the Swiss Light Source", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, (20140417), vol. 9048, doi:10.1117/12.2046226, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 904811-1 - 904811-7, XP060030804 [XP] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2046226 | [X] - HARADA TETSUO ET AL, "Imaging of extreme-ultraviolet mask patterns using coherent extreme-ultraviolet scatterometry microscope based on coherent diffraction imaging", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AVS / AIP, MELVILLE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 29, no. 6, doi:10.1116/1.3657525, ISSN 1071-1023, (20111101), pages 6F503-1 - 6F503-7, (20111103), XP012154901 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.3657525 | [I] - HARADA TETSUO ET AL, "The coherent EUV scatterometry microscope for actinic mask inspection and metrology", PHOTOMASK AND NEXT-GENERATION LITHOGRAPHY MASK TECHNOLOGY XVIII, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20110429), vol. 8081, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.896576, pages 1 - 9, XP060015146 [I] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.896576 | [A] - MAIDEN A M ET AL, "An improved ptychographical phase retrieval algorithm for diffractive imaging", ULTRAMICROSCOPY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 109, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.ULTRAMIC.2009.05.012, ISSN 0304-3991, (20090901), pages 1256-1 - 1262-6, (20090606), XP026470501 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultramic.2009.05.012 | [A] - BOSHENG ZHANG ET AL, "Coherent diffractive imaging microscope with a tabletop high harmonic EUV source", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (20130410), vol. 8681, doi:10.1117/12.2011615, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 86810H-1 - 86810H-7, XP055141260 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2011615 | [T] - Ding Qi ET AL, "A New Inspection Method for a EUV Mask Defect Inspection System", National Taiwan University, Taipei, Taiwan, (20140626), pages 1 - 27, URL: http://www.euvlitho.com/2014/P63.pdf, (20140919), XP055141482 [T] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | - K. A. GOLDBERG; I. MOCHI, JVST B, (2010), page C6E1 | - K. A. GOLDBERG ET AL., JVST B, (2009), vol. 27, page 2916 | - K. A. GOLDBERG ET AL., PROC. SPIE, (2011), vol. 7969, page 796910 | - JAP. J. APPL. PHYS., (2010), vol. 49, pages 06GD07 - 1 | - T. HARADA ET AL., JVST B, (2009), vol. 27, page 3203 | - J. DOH ET AL., J. KOREAN PHYSICAL SOC., (2010), vol. 57, page 1486 | - SANDBERG ET AL., OPTICS LETTERS, (2009), vol. 34, page 1618 | - S. ROY ET AL., NATURE PHOTONICS, (2011), vol. 5, page 243 |