EP3005345 - ACOUSTIC RADIATOR ASSEMBLY FOR ACTIVE SOUND DAMPERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAY, Karlheinz Belaustr. 18A 70195 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
LEISTNER, Michael Sindelbachstr. 19 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
LEISTNER, Philipp Hanne-Schorp-Pflumm-Weg 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
MAYSENHÖLDER, Waldemar Altenbergstr. 33 70180 Stutttgart / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14729640.4 | 06.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP61859 | Priority number, date | DE201310210709 | 07.06.2013 Original published format: DE102013210709 | [2016/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014195473 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005345 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/178 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G10K11/17873 (EP,US);
G10K11/17857 (EP,US);
G10K2210/112 (EP);
G10K2210/3219 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | SCHALLSTRAHLER -ANORDNUNG FÜR AKTIVE SCHALLDÄMPFER | [2016/15] | English: | ACOUSTIC RADIATOR ASSEMBLY FOR ACTIVE SOUND DAMPERS | [2016/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉMETTEURS SONORES DESTINÉ À UN SILENCIEUX | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 30.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 09.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2088951 (LORD CORP) [X] 1,4 * figures 3,4 * * page 1, lines 1-14 * * page 2, lines 3-11 * [I] 2,6; | [XI]GB2160742 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 3,4 * * column 1 * * page 2, line 120 - page 3, line 7 * [I] 6; | [XI]US5590849 (PLA FREDERIC G [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 9 * [I] 7-9; | [XI]WO9712360 (LORD CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * figure 1 * * page 1, lines 5-7 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 18 * * page 8, lines 3-5 * [I] 2,8,9; | [A]DE20205160U (NIEMEYER CARL HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 3 * * page 1, lines 10-15,46-48 * * page 2, lines 29-47 ** page 4, lines 1-6 * |