Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10030089 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2018 | B2 | US2016083492 | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361819928 | 06.05.2013 | WO2014US36991 | 06.05.2014 | US201414889290 | 06.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102336797B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2021 | B1 | KR20160020423 | 23.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361819928 | 06.05.2013 | WO2014US36991 | 06.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6389246B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2018 | B2 | JP2016519195 | 30.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361819928 | 06.05.2013 | WO2014US36991 | 06.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105377919B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2019 | B | CN105377919 | 02.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361819928 | 06.05.2013 | WO2014US36991 | 06.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2981563 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2018 | B1 | EP2981563 | 10.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361819928 | 06.05.2013 | WO2014US36991 | 06.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015027832 | 18.08.2020 | B1 | BR112015027832 | 24.04.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361819928 | 06.05.2013 | WO2014US36991 | 06.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014182713 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361819928 | 06.05.2013 |