EP2994470 - PYRIDO[2,3-D]PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/11] | QUINOLONE DERIVATIVES AS FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR INHIBITORS | ||
[2017/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Principia Biopharma Inc. 400 East Jamie Court, Suite 302 So. San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMELD, Kenneth A. 345 Camino Al Lago Meno Park, California 94002 / US | 02 /
VERNER, Erik 1521 Notre Dame Ave. Belmont, California 94002 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/11] | Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14730018.0 | 07.05.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014US37173 | Priority number, date | US201361821468P | 09.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361821468 P | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014182829 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994470 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2994470 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIDO[2,3-D]PYRIMIDIN-DERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN DES FIBROBLASTENWACHSTUMSFAKTORS | [2017/45] | English: | PYRIDO[2,3-D]PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR INHIBITORS | [2017/45] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIDO[2,3-D]PYRIMIDINE EN TANT QU' INHIBITEURS DE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DE FIBROBLASTE | [2017/46] |
Former [2016/11] | CHINOLONDERIVATE ALS FIBROBLASTEN-WACHSTUMSFAKTORINHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2016/11] | QUINOLONE DERIVATIVES AS FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2016/11] | DÉRIVÉS DE QUINOLONE À UTILISER EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DES FIBROBLASTES | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 29.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2014 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | IT | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | IE | 07.05.2018 | LU | 07.05.2018 | MT | 07.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.05.2014 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
MT | 07.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.05.2014 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
MT | 07.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
MT | 07.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
MT | 07.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US5620981 (BLANKLEY CLIFTON J [US], et al) [I] 1-20,22-25 * claim 1 * * table 1 * [A] 21; | [IA]WO2005105097 (GPC BIOTECH AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-20,22-25 * claim 1 * * page 31, lines 20-24 * [A] 21; | [A]WO2008150260 (GPC BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * compound 96 ** claim 1 * | by applicant | US4107288 | US5145684 | - CANCER RES, vol. 64, pages 40 - 47 | - KEATS, J.J., "Ten years and counting: so what do we know about t(4;14)(p16;q32) multiple myeloma", LEUK LYMPHOMA, (2006), vol. 47, pages 2289 - 2300 | - BILLEREY, C. ET AL., "Frequent FGFR3 mutations in papillary non-invasive bladder (pTa) tumors", AM JPATHOL, (2001), vol. 158, pages 1955 - 1959 | - WILLIAMS, S. V.; HURST, C. D.; KNOWLES, M. A., "Oncogenic FGFR3 gene fusions in bladder cancer.", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (2013), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1093/hmg/dds486, pages 795 - 803, XP055128302 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/dds486 | - POLLOCK, P.M. ET AL., "Frequent activating FGFR2 mutations in endometrial carcinomas parallel germline mutations associated with craniosynostosis and skeletal dysplasia syndromes", ONCOGENE, (2007), vol. 26, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.onc.1210529, pages 7158 - 7162, XP008119360 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1210529 | - JANG, J.H., "Mutations in fibroblast growth factor receptor 2 and fibroblast growth factor receptor 3 genes associated with human gastric and colorectal cancers.", CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 3541 - 3543 | - SAHADEVAN, K., D, "Selective over-expression of fibroblast growth factor receptors 1 and 4 in clinical prostate cancer.", JPATHOL, (2007), vol. 213, pages 82 - 90 | - HANADA K ET AL., "Identification of fibroblast growth factor-5 as an overexpressed anti-gen in multiple human adenocarcinomas", CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 5511 - 6 | - ARAI, Y. ET AL., "Fibroblast growth factor receptor 2 tyrosine kinase fusions define a unique molecular subtype of cholangiocarcinoma", HEPATOLOGY, (2014), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1002/hep.26890, pages 1427 - 1434, XP055215548 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.26890 | - BORAD, M. J. ET AL., "Integrated genomic characterization reveals novel, therapeutically relevant drug targets in FGFR and EGFR pathways in sporadic intrahepatic cholangiocarcinoma. PLoS genetics 10, e1004135) and glioblastoma (see Rand V., et. al. Sequence survey of receptor tyrosine kinases reveals mutations in gliobla", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2014), vol. 102, pages 14344 - 9 | - PARKER, "Emergence of FGFR family gene fusions as therapeutic targets in a wide spectrum of solid tumours", THE JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (2014), vol. 232, pages 4 - 15 | - JACKSON, C. C.; MEDEIROS, L. J.; MIRANDA, R. N., "8pl 1 myeloproliferative syndrome: a review.", HUMAN PATHOLOGY, (2010), vol. 41, pages 461 - 476, XP026975482 | - HARADA, D., "FGFR3-related dwarfism and cell signaling.", J BONE MINER METAB, (2009), vol. 27, pages 9 - 15, XP019660765 | - BELLUS, G.A., "Achondroplasia is defined by recurrent G380R mutations of FGFR3", AM JHUM GENET, (1995), vol. 56, pages 368 - 373 | - BELLUS, G.A., "A recurrent mutation in the tyrosine kinase domain of fibroblast growth factor receptor 3 causes hypochondroplasia", NAT GENET, (1995), vol. 10, pages 357 - 359 | - ROUSSEAU, F., "Mutations in the gene encoding fibroblast growth factor receptor-3 in achondroplasia", NATURE, (1994), vol. 371, doi:doi:10.1038/371252a0, pages 252 - 254, XP002071230 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/371252a0 | - PRINOS, P., "A common FGFR3 gene mutation in hypochondroplasia", HUM MOL GENET, (1995), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1093/hmg/4.11.2097, pages 2097 - 2101, XP009185714 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/4.11.2097 | - MUENKE, M. ET AL., "A unique point mutation in the fibroblast growth factor receptor 3 gene (FGFR3) defines a new craniosynostosis syndrome.", AM JHUM GENET, (1997), vol. 60, pages 555 - 564 | - BELLUS, G.A. ET AL., "Severe achondroplasia with developmental delay and acanthosis nigricans (SADDAN): phenotypic analysis of a new skeletal dysplasia caused by a Lys650Met mutation in fibroblast growth factor receptor 3.", AM JMED GENET, (1999), vol. 85, pages 53 - 65 | - TAVORMINA, P.L. ET AL., "A novel skeletal dysplasia with developmental delay and acanthosis nigricans is caused by a Lys650Met mutation in the fibroblast growth factor receptor 3 gene", AM J HUM GENET, (1999), vol. 64, pages 722 - 731 | - D'AVIS, P.Y., "Constitutive activation of fibroblast growth factor receptor 3 by mutations responsible for the lethal skeletal dysplasia thanatophoric dysplasia type I.", CELL GROWTH DIFFER, (1998), vol. 9, pages 71 - 78 | - KITOH, H., "Lys650Met substitution in the tyrosine kinase domain of the fibroblast growth factor receptor gene causes thanatophoric dysplasia Type I. Mutations in brief no. 199. Online", HUM MUTAT, (1998), vol. 12, pages 362 - 363 | - TAVORMINA, P.L., "Thanatophoric dysplasia (types I and II) caused by distinct mutations in fibroblast growth factor receptor 3", NAT GENET, (1995), vol. 9, pages 321 - 328 | - BRODIE, S.G., "Platyspondylic lethal skeletal dysplasia, San Diego type, is caused by FGFR3 mutations", AM JMED GENET, (1999), vol. 84, pages 476 - 480 | - CAPPELLEN, D., "Frequent activating mutations of FGFR3 in human bladder and cervix carcinomas.", NAT GENET, (1999), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1038/12615, pages 18 - 20, XP002181676 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/12615 | - SHUKLA, N., "Oncogene mutation profiling of pediatric solid tumors reveals significant subsets of embryonal rhabdomyosarcoma and neuroblastoma with mutated genes in growth signaling pathways", CLIN CANCER RES, vol. 18, pages 748 - 757 | - MARSHALL, A.D., "PAX3-FOXO and FGFR4 in alveolar rhabdomyosarcoma.", MOL CARCINOG, vol. 51, pages 807 - 815 | - Fieser and Fieser's Reagents for Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1-17 | - Rodd's Chemistry of Carbon Compounds, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 1-5 | - Organic Reactions, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1-40 | - March's Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS | - LAHI, DAVID W.; ESPENSON, JAMES H, "Oxidation of Sulfoxides by Hydrogen Peroxide, Catalyzed by Methyltrioxorhenium(VII", INORG. CHEM, (2000), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 2164 - 2167 | - "Rhenium oxo complexes in catalytic oxidations", CATAL. TODAY, (2000), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 317 - 363 | - COPERET, CHRISTOPHE; ADOLFSSON, HANS; KHUONG, TINH-ALFREDO V.; YUDIN, ANDREI K.; SHARPLESS, K. BARRY, "A Simple and Efficient Method for the Preparation of Pyridine N-Oxides", J. ORG. CHEM., (1998), vol. 63, no. 5, pages 1740 - 1741 |