EP2986524 - CONTAINER FOR FRUIT AND VEGETABLE PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE CONTAINER AND FOR PACKING SUCH PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SORMA S.P.A. Via delle Mele n. 65 47023 Cesena FO / IT | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCADINI, Andrea c/o Sorma S.p.A. Via Delle Mele 65 I-47522 Bologna / IT | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Fuochi, Riccardo APTA S.r.l. Piazza dei Martiri, 1 40121 Bologna BO / IT | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 14730993.4 | 25.03.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014IB60137 | Priority number, date | IT2013BO00164 | 15.04.2013 Original published format: IT BO20130164 | [2016/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014170774 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986524 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986524 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D30/06, B65D33/06, B65D85/34, B65D25/04 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
B65D85/34 (EP,US);
B29C65/745 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/4312 (EP,US);
B65B25/048 (EP,US);
B65B51/22 (US);
B65B61/20 (US);
B65B7/02 (US);
B65D29/04 (EP,US);
B65D33/06 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/729 (EP,US);
B29C66/81435 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR OBST- UND GEMÜSEPRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES BEHÄLTERS UND ZUM VERPACKEN SOLCHER PRODUKTE | [2016/08] | English: | CONTAINER FOR FRUIT AND VEGETABLE PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE CONTAINER AND FOR PACKING SUCH PRODUCTS | [2016/08] | French: | RECIPIENT POUR PRODUITS DE FRUIT ET LEGUME ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DU RECIPIENT ET D'EMBALLAGE DE TELS PRODUITS | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 07.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 29.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 19.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2014 | AL | 10.05.2017 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.03.2014 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 25.03.2014 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XDAYI]ES1027802U (PANIAGUA OLAECHEA ROSALINA [ES]) [XD] 1,2,7-10,16-18,24 * column 2, line 19 - line 32 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 17; figures 1,8 * [A] 11-15,25,26 [Y] 19-23 [I] 3-6; | [XY]US2009046957 (LIANG HSIEHYUEH WANG [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0030] , [0037]; figures 5,6,7,8 * [Y] 23; | [YDA]EP2210735 (GAVIPLAS S L [ES]) [YD] 19-22 * abstract * [A] 1; | [A]US5076040 (DAVIS STEVEN D [US]) [A] 18-26 * column 1, line 60 - line 65; figures 3-5 *; | [A]NL70363C (CORNELIUS WILLEM TEMPELMANS PLAT) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [AD]US5912197 (MADDEROM ROBERT W [US]) [AD] 1-25 * column 1, line 30 - line 65; figure 4 *; | [XI]EP0677449 (PANIAGUA OLAECHEA ROSALINA [ES]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 44 - line 55; figure 5 * [I] 3,4; | [X]DE2636821 (TAKASAKI KUNICHIKA) [X] 1 * figures 5,6,18 * | by applicant | ES1027802U | EP2535281 | EP2210735 | US5912197 | WO2011034038 |