EP3019039 - SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/20] | A SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPOSITION AND A METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | ||
[2017/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swedish Match North Europe AB 118 85 Stockholm / SE | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINDVALL, Mårten Gunnel Weinåsvägen 17 415 24 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
LUNDIN, Jörgen Dragonvägen 26 194 33 Upplands-Väsby / SE | [2017/31] |
Former [2016/20] | 01 /
KINDVALL, Mårten Gunnel Weinåsvägen 17 S-415 24 Göteborg / SE | ||
02 /
LUNDIN, Jörgen Dragonvägen 26 S-194 33 Upplands-Väsby / SE | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [2016/20] | Application number, filing date | 14731288.8 | 19.06.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014EP62954 | Priority number, date | EP20130175932 | 10.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13175932 | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015003883 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3019039 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3019039 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A24B13/00 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
A24B13/00 (EP,RU,US);
A24B15/30 (EP,US);
A24F23/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHLOSE TABAKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2017/10] | English: | SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | [2017/15] | French: | COMPOSITION DE TABAC SANS FUMÉE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/10] |
Former [2016/20] | RAUCHLOSE TABAKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2016/20] | A SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPOSITION AND A METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | ||
Former [2016/20] | COMPOSITION DE TABAC SANS FUMÉE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 14.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2014 | AL | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | ES | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | IT | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.06.2014 | |
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.06.2014 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | EE | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | EE | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | EE | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | EE | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004056218 (SWEDISH MATCH NORTH EUROPE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008133563 (SWEDISH MATCH NORTH EUROPE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5346734 (WYDICK JR RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006065192 (SWEDISH MATCH NORTH EUROPE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - DE WIT J C ET AL, "Antimicrobial activity of sodium lactate", FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, LONDON, GB, vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0740-0020(90)90017-C, ISSN 0740-0020, (19900601), pages 113 - 120, (19900601), XP024007942 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0740-0020(90)90017-C |