EP2999797 - ISOFORMS OF GATA6 AND NKX2-1 AS MARKERS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY OF CANCER AND AS TARGETS FOR ANTI-CANCER THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | For all designated states Justus-Liebig-Universität Giessen Ludwigstrasse 23 35390 Giessen / DE | [2018/27] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Justus-Liebig- Universitat Giessen Ludwigstrasse 23 35390 Giessen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRETO, Guillermo Luisenthalerstr. 14 61184 Karben / DE | 02 /
MEHTA, Aditi Hermann Ehlers Straße 9 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | 03 /
SINGH, Indrabahadur Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 8 61169 Friedberg / DE | 04 /
SZIBOR, Marten Niipperintie 26b FIN-02920 Espoo / FI | 05 /
SAVAI, Rajkumar Lessingstraße 1 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | 06 /
SEEGER, Werner Schafsweg 19 35444 Biebertal / DE | 07 /
BRAUN, Thomas Höhenweg 20 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | 08 /
GÜNTHER, Andreas Bahnhofstraße 31 35415 Pohlheim Watzenborn-Steinberg / DE | 09 /
KRÜGER, Marcus Schwalheimer Str. 9F 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/13] | Application number, filing date | 14731556.8 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014EP60489 | Priority number, date | EP20130168629 | 21.05.2013 Original published format: EP 13168629 | EP20130168636 | 21.05.2013 Original published format: EP 13168636 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014187881 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999797 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2999797 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEZIFISCHE ISOFORMEN VON GATA6 UND NKX2-1 ALS NEUE MARKER ZUR DIAGNOSE UND FÜR THERAPIEANSÄTZE BEI KREBS UND ALS ZIELE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2017/27] | English: | ISOFORMS OF GATA6 AND NKX2-1 AS MARKERS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY OF CANCER AND AS TARGETS FOR ANTI-CANCER THERAPY | [2016/13] | French: | ISOFORMES SPÉCIFIQUES DE GATA6 ET NKX2-1 EN TANT QUE NOUVEAUX MARQUEURS POUR LES APPROCHES DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE THÉRAPIE DU CANCER ET EN TANT QUE CIBLES POUR LA THÉRAPIE ANTICANCÉREUSE | [2017/27] |
Former [2016/13] | ISOFORMEN VON GATA6 UND NKX2-1 ALS MARKER ZUR DIAGNOSE UND THERAPIE VON KREBS UND ALS TARGETS ZUR KREBSTHERAPIE | ||
Former [2016/13] | ISOFORMES DE GATA6 ET DE NKX2-1 UTILISÉS EN TANT QUE MARQUEURS POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LA CANCÉROTHÉRAPIE ET EN TANT QUE CIBLES POUR UNE THÉRAPIE ANTICANCÉREUSE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 27.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18181398.1 / EP3461909 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2014 | AL | 04.07.2018 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | MT | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 04.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004060302 (CEMINES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * claims 5-9, 22-28 *; | [AD] - MONTE M. WINSLOW ET AL, "Suppression of lung adenocarcinoma progression by Nkx2-1", NATURE, (20110406), vol. 473, no. 7345, doi:10.1038/nature09881, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 101 - 104, XP055081012 [AD] 1-27 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09881 | [AD] - J. KENDALL ET AL, "Oncogenic cooperation and coamplification of developmental transcription factor genes in lung cancer", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20070904), vol. 104, no. 42, doi:10.1073/pnas.0708286104, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 16663 - 16668, XP055081009 [AD] 1-27 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0708286104 | [AD] - M. GUO, "Hypermethylation of the GATA Genes in Lung Cancer", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (20041201), vol. 10, no. 23, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-1140, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 7917 - 7924, XP055081008 [AD] 1-27 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-1140 | [A] - COULSON J M ET AL, "A Splice Variant of the Neuron-restrictive Silencer Factor Repressor Is Expressed in Small Cell Lung Cancer: A Potential Role in Depression of Neuroendocrine Genes and a Useful Clinical Marker", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20000401), vol. 60, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1840 - 1844, XP003002388 [A] 1-27 * abstract * | [A] - MATSUMOTO R ET AL, "SHORT ALTERNATIVE SPLICE TRANSCRIPTS OF THE MDM2 ONCOGENE CORRELATE TO MALIGNANCY IN HUMAN ASTROCYTIC NEOPLASMS", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (19980101), vol. 58, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 609 - 613, XP008071095 [A] 1-27 * abstract * | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0036676 | EP0052322 | EP0058481 | JPS58118008 | EP0088046 | DE3218121 | EP0102324 | US4485045 | EP0133988 | EP0142641 | EP0143949 | US4544545 | - HERBST RS ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2008), vol. 359, no. 13, pages 1367 - 80 | - GUO M ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, no. 23, pages 7917 - 24 | - KENDALL J ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2007), vol. 104, no. 42, pages 16663 - 8 | - TANG Y ET AL., CELL RES., (2011), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 316 - 26 | - ROLLIN ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, no. 1, page E4158 | - WINSLOW, NATURE, (2011), vol. 473, no. 7345, pages 101 - 104 | - LINDHOLM, JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, (2009), vol. 62, no. 4, pages 339 - 344 | - GORSHKOVE, BIOCHEMISTRY (MOSC, (2005), vol. 70, pages 1180 - 1184 | - MARGANA RK; BOGGARAM V., J BIOL CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 5, pages 3083 - 90 | - MINOO P ET AL., DEV BIOL., (1999), vol. 209, no. 1, pages 60 - 71 | - KEIJZER R ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (2001), vol. 128, no. 4, pages 503 - 11 | - WAN H ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, no. 14, pages 13809 - 16 | - WAN H ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2004), vol. 101, no. 40, pages 14449 - 54 | - ERAMO A ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2010), vol. 29, no. 33, pages 4625 - 35 | - EARLY DETECTION OF LUNG CANCER, SCIENCEDAILY, (20090509), URL: sciencedaily.com/releases/2009/05/090502093211.htm | - HOWINGTON JA ET AL., CHEST JOURNAL, (2013), vol. 143, pages E278S - E313S | - GOLDSTRAW P. ET AL., J THORAC ONCOL., (2007), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 706 - 14 | - BEADSMOORE CJ; SCREATON NJ, EUR J RADIOL., (2003), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 8 - 17 | - MOUNTAIN CF, CHEST, (1997), vol. 111, no. 6, pages 1710 - 7 | - SCHNEIDER, MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2012), vol. 1, page E46 | - DOU, JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2012), vol. 16, pages 875 - 883 | - SONG, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 709 - 717 | - TANG Y ET AL., CELL RES, (2011), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 316 - 26 | - ROLLIN J ET AL., PLOS ONE., (2009), vol. 4, no. 1, page E4158 | - MARGANA RK; BOGGARAM V, J BIOL CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 5, pages 3083 - 90 | - WAN H ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (2004), vol. 101, no. 40, pages 14449 - 54 | - SIDMAN, U. ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (1983), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556 | - R. LANGER ET AL., J. BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1981), vol. 15, pages 167 - 277 | - R. LANGER, CHEM. TECH., (1982), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105 | - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 3688 - 3692 | - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4030 - 4034 | - HUGHES ET AL., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2001), vol. 6, pages 303 - 315 | - LIANG ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2002), vol. 269, pages 5753 - 5758 | - BECKER ET AL., In Antisense Technology in the Central Nervous System, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, pages 147 - 157 | - EFFROS ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED., (2012), vol. 185, no. 8, pages 803 - 804 | - PRESTRIDGE, JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 249, pages 923 - 932 | - THIERRY-MIEG, GENOME BIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 7, no. 1, page 12 | - LIANG CC ET AL., NAT PROTOC., (2007), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 329 - 33 | - MANI, CELL, (2008), vol. 133, no. 4, pages 704 - 715 | - BISHOP JA ET AL., HUM PATHOL., (2010), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 20 - 5 | - KALHOR, MODERN PATHOLOGYL, (2006), vol. 9, pages 1117 - 1123 | - HOFFMAN PC ET AL., LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, no. 9202, pages 479 - 85 | - HYDE L; HYDE CL, CHEST, (1974), vol. 65, no. 3, pages 299 - 306 | - STRAUSS GM; DOMINIONI L, J SURG ONCOL, (2013), vol. 108, no. 5, pages 294 - 300 | - D'URSO V ET AL., J CELL PHYSIOL, (2013), vol. 228, no. 5, pages 945 - 51 | - TRAVIS WD ET AL., ARCH PATHOL LAB MED, (2013), vol. 137, no. 5, pages 668 - 84 | - KOLLA V ET AL., AM J RESPIR CELL MOL BIOL, (2007), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 213 - 25 | - ZHANG Y ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (2007), vol. 134, no. 1, pages 189 - 98 | - TIAN Y ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (2011), vol. 138, no. 7, pages 1235 - 45 | - GUO M ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 10, no. 23, pages 7917 - 24 | - GORSHKOVA EV ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY (MOSC, (2005), vol. 70, no. 10, pages 1180 - 4 | - LINDHOLM PM ET AL., J CLIN PATHOL, (2009), vol. 62, no. 4, pages 339 - 44 | - WINSLOW MM ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 473, no. 7345, pages 101 - 4 | - CHEUNG WK ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2013), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 725 - 38 | - CHEN PM ET AL., CARCINOGENESIS, (2013), vol. 34, no. 11, pages 2655 - 63 | - HORVATH I ET AL., EUR RESPIR J, (2005), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 523 - 48 | - MONTUSCHI P, THER ADV RESPIR DIS, (2007), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 5 - 23 | - HO LP ET AL., THORAX, (1998), vol. 53, no. 8, pages 680 - 4 | - SHAHID SK ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2002), vol. 165, no. 9, pages 1290 - 3 | - HUSZAR E ET AL., EUR RESPIR J, (2002), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 1393 - 8 | - EFFROS RM ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2002), vol. 165, no. 5, pages 663 - 9 | - MONTUSCHI P ET AL., THORAX, (2003), vol. 58, no. 7, pages 585 - 8 | - KOSTIKAS K ET AL., EUR RESPIR J, (2003), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 743 - 7 | - EFFROS RM ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2012), vol. 185, no. 8, pages 803 - 4 | - DAVIS MD ET AL., IMMUNOL ALLERGY CLIN NORTH AM, (2012), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 363 - 75 | - KULLMANN T ET AL., PATHOL ONCOL RES, (2008), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 481 - 3 | - CARPAGNANO GE ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (2010), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 108 - 13 | - ZAKHARKINA T ET AL., RESPIROLOGY, (2011), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 932 - 8 | - XU Z ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 7, page E41137 | - GESSNER C ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (2004), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 215 - 22 | - XIAO P ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (2014), vol. 83, no. 1, pages 56 - 60 | - IARC, MONOGR EVAL CARCINOG RISK CHEM HUM, (1986), vol. 38, pages 35 - 394 | - XU ZY ET AL., J NATL CANCER INST, (1989), vol. 81, no. 23, pages 1800 - 6 | - ZHONG L ET AL., CANCER CAUSES CONTROL, (1999), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 607 - 16 | - HENSCHKE CL ET AL., LANCET, (1999), vol. 354, no. 9173, pages 99 - 105 | - JETT JR, CLIN CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 11, no. 13, pages 4988S - 4992S | - BHATTACHARJEE A ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2001), vol. 98, no. 24, pages 13790 - 5 | - MEYERSON M; CARBONE D, J CLIN ONCOL, (2005), vol. 23, no. 14, pages 3219 - 26 | - BEER DG ET AL., NAT MED, (2002), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 816 - 24 | - CHEN HY ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2007), vol. 356, no. 1, pages 11 - 20 |