Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] |
22.09.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.08.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
04.08.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.06.2016 | Change - representative | |
25.03.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
25.03.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
26.01.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.12.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.12.2015 | Change - representative | |
15.12.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.05.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.01.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.12.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.07.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication |