Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019314530 | ![]() | 17.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201916423377 | 28.05.2019 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | US201514898767 | 16.12.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016136304 | ![]() | 19.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201414898767 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102217217B | ![]() | 18.02.2021 | B1 | KR20160027011 | 09.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6484229B | ![]() | 13.03.2019 | B2 | JP2016523244 | 08.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL243091 | ![]() | 30.04.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105431174B | ![]() | 07.06.2019 | B | CN105431174 | 23.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2915145 | ![]() | 08.06.2021 | C | CA2915145 | 24.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014283232B | ![]() | 28.03.2019 | B2 | AU2014283232 | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3010552 | ![]() | 17.04.2019 | B1 | EP3010552 | 27.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14731952 | 19.06.2014 | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015031984 | 25.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1121770T | 31.07.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP14731952 | 19.06.2014 | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3010552T | 11.06.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA033792 | 26.11.2019 | B1 | EA201690042 | 30.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2727874T | 21.10.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1222561 | 07.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20190848T | 09.08.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP14731952 | 19.06.2014 | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3010552T | 25.07.2019 | T | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA38710 | 29.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015017780 | 06.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ715180 | 29.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3010552T | 30.09.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP14731952 | 19.06.2014 | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS58800 | 31.07.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP14731952 | 19.06.2014 | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201510468T | 28.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3010552T | 30.08.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP14731952 | 19.06.2014 | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA124448 | 22.09.2021 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62976 | 19.06.2014 | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014202738 | ![]() | 24.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE043358T | 28.08.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3010552T | 05.06.2019 | T | Priority number | Date | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201907566T | 21.06.2019 | T4 | Priority number | Date | US201361837406 | 20.06.2013 | EP13305830 | 20.06.2013 |