EP3011321 - CODED-APERTURE X-RAY IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UCL Business Ltd University College London Gower Street London WC1E 6BT / GB | [2022/13] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states UCL BUSINESS LTD The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London W1T 4TP / GB | ||
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states UCL Business Plc. The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London W1T 4TP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDRIZZI, Marco 15B New Wharf Road London N1 9RT / GB | 02 /
OLIVO, Alessandro 18 Embassy Lodge Regents Park Road London N3 3LB / GB | 03 /
DIEMOZ, Paul The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London W1T 4TP / GB | 04 /
MILLARD, Thomas The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London W1T 4TP / GB | 05 /
VITTORIA, Fabio The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London W1T 4TP / GB | [2018/04] |
Former [2016/17] | 01 /
ENDREZZI, Marco 15B New Wharf Road London N1 9RT / GB | ||
02 /
OLIVO, Alessandro 18 Embassy Lodge Regents Park Road London N3 3LB / GB | |||
03 /
DIEMOZ, Paul The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London W1T 4TP / GB | |||
04 /
MILLARD, Thomas The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London W1T 4TP / GB | |||
05 /
VITTORIA, Fabio The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road London W1T 4TP / GB | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2023/31] |
Former [2016/17] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14731991.7 | 29.05.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014GB51629 | Priority number, date | GB20130011091 | 21.06.2013 Original published format: GB 201311091 | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014202949 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3011321 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3011321 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, G01N23/041 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
A61B6/484 (EP,US);
A61B6/5205 (EP,US);
G01N23/041 (EP,US);
A61B6/4035 (EP,US);
A61B6/4291 (EP,US);
G01N2223/401 (EP,US);
G01N2223/612 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | G01N23/04, A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENBILDGEBUNG MIT CODIERTER APERTUR | [2016/17] | English: | CODED-APERTURE X-RAY IMAGING | [2016/17] | French: | IMAGERIE PAR RAYONS X À OUVERTURE CODÉE | [2023/10] |
Former [2016/17] | IMAGERIE À RAYONS X À OUVERTURE CODÉE | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 10.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2441578 (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,17-23 * pages 6, 7; figures 1, 2 * * page 11, line 15 - line 20 * * page 13, line 6 - line 11; figure 7 *; | [AD]WO2013011317 (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1-23 * whole document, in particular page 4, lines 19-22 and figure 1 *; | [I] - P. R. T. MUNRO ET AL, "Phase and absorption retrieval using incoherent X-ray sources", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20120813), vol. 109, no. 35, doi:10.1073/pnas.1205396109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13922 - 13927, XP055133408 [I] 1,3,5,10,18,19,21-23 * page 13922, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 13923, column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1205396109 | [A] - OLIVO ALESSANDRO ET AL, "A coded-aperture technique allowing x-ray phase contrast imaging with conventional sources", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20070816), vol. 91, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.2772193, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 74106 - 74106, XP012100704 [A] 1-23 * pages 074106-2, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2772193 | [A] - RIGON LUIGI ET AL, "Three-image diffraction enhanced imaging algorithm to extract absorption, refraction, and ultrasmall-angle scattering", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20070313), vol. 90, no. 11, doi:10.1063/1.2713147, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 114102 - 114102, XP012093640 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2713147 |