10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
05.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
22.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
15.02.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
09.03.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
06.03.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.02.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.02.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.11.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.03.2017 |
First examination report |
|
23.09.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] |
26.08.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
22.04.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
13.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|