Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016174105 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62506 | 16.06.2014 | DE102013214005 | 17.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105393510B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2019 | B | CN105393510 | 09.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62506 | 16.06.2014 | DE102013214005 | 17.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3022878 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2018 | B1 | EP3022878 | 25.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62506 | 16.06.2014 | DE102013214005 | 17.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2671149T | 05.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP62506 | 16.06.2014 | DE102013214005 | 17.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015007442 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013214005 | 17.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013214005 | 19.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013214005 | 17.07.2013 |