EP3003980 - METHOD FOR RECOVERING AMMONIUM SULPHATE FROM A UREA PLANT GAS STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RECOVERING AMMONIUM SULPHATE FROM A UREA PLANT GAS STREAM | ||
[2019/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saipem S.p.A. Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNO, Lorenzo c/o SAIPEM S.p.A. Via Martiri di Cefalonia 67 I-20097 San Donato Milanese / IT | 02 /
GIANAZZA, Alessandro c/o SAIPEM S.p.A. Via Martiri di Cefalonia 67 I-20097 San Donato Milanese / IT | 03 /
CARLESSI, Lino Via Pascolo 47 I-24044 Dalmine / IT | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Cernuzzi, Daniele, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14732402.4 | 22.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014IB61626 | Priority number, date | IT2013MI00847 | 24.05.2013 Original published format: IT MI20130847 | [2016/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014188371 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003980 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003980 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C273/16, C01C1/242, C01C1/12 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
C01C1/12 (EP,RU);
C01C1/242 (EP,RU);
C07C273/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | C01C1/242, C01C1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON AMMONIUMSULFAT AUS EINEM GASSTROM EINER HARNSTOFFANLAGE | [2019/45] | English: | METHOD FOR RECOVERING AMMONIUM SULPHATE FROM A UREA PLANT GAS STREAM | [2019/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE SULFATE D'AMMONIUM DANS UN FLUX GAZEUX D'USINE D'URÉE | [2019/45] |
Former [2016/15] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON AMMONIUMSULFAT AUS EINEM GASSTROM EINER HARNSTOFFANLAGE | ||
Former [2016/15] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RECOVERING AMMONIUM SULPHATE FROM A UREA PLANT GAS STREAM | ||
Former [2016/15] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE SULFATE D'AMMONIUM DANS UN FLUX GAZEUX D'USINE D'URÉE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 13.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2014 | AL | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | IE | 22.05.2020 | LU | 22.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | GB | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GB | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GB | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GB | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | NO | 08.07.2020 | |
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3785796 (MANN H); | [Y]WO0151429 (PIESTERITZ STICKSTOFF [DE], et al); | [X]WO2006004424 (YARA INT ASA [NO], et al); | [X]EP2192099 (UHDE FERTILIZER TECHNOLOGY BV [NL]) | by applicant | US3785796 | EP2192099 |