EP2999728 - ARTICLES MADE FROM THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANES WITH CRYSTALLINE CHAIN ENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKAL, Umit G. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | 02 /
STEINMETZ, Bryce W. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | 03 /
LU, Qiwei 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | 04 /
DAY, Roger W. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Bradley, Josephine Mary Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14732724.1 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014US38879 | Priority number, date | US201361826096P | 22.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361826096 P | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014189993 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999728 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/76, C08G18/28, C08G18/32, C08G18/42, C08G18/44, C08L75/08 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
C08G18/4854 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08G18/2825 (EP,US);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,US);
C08G18/664 (EP,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C08G18/7657 (EP,US);
C08L75/08 (EP,US);
D01F6/70 (EP,US);
C08J2375/08 (US);
C08J2423/06 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L75/08, C08L23/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Title | German: | GEGENSTÄNDE AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEN POLYURETHANEN MIT KRISTALLKETTENENDEN | [2016/13] | English: | ARTICLES MADE FROM THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANES WITH CRYSTALLINE CHAIN ENDS | [2016/13] | French: | ARTICLES RÉALISÉS À PARTIR DE POLYURÉTHANES THERMOPLASTIQUES À TERMINAISONS DE CHAÎNE CRISTALLINES | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 18.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2418075 (BAYER AG) [X] 1-29* examples 1,2,4,5,7 *; | [X]US5472785 (STOBBIE IV CHARLES W [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * examples 1-8; tables 2,3 *; | [X]US5491211 (RIECK JAMES N [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * example 3 *; | [X]US2003036621 (CHAN JACK C [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * example 2 *; | [X]WO2008147845 (FULLER H B LICENSING FINANC [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * page 7, lines 20-28 * * example 1 * | Examination | EP2914640 | by applicant | US3971373 | US4100324 | US4118531 | US4131731 | US4429001 | US2011186329 | - PLASTICS EXTRUSION TECHNOLOGY, HANSER PUBLISHERS, (1988), pages 26 - 37 | - CONCISE ENCYCLOPEDIA OF POLYMER SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1990), pages 90 - 92 | - "Superfine Thermoplastic Fibers", VAN A. WENTE, Industrial Engineering Chemistry, NAVAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES, (19540525), vol. 48, pages 1342 - 1346 | - E. P. MOORE, JR. ET AL., Polypropylene Handbook, HANSER/GARDNER PUBLICATIONS, INC., (1996), pages 314 - 322 |