Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2022288096 | ![]() | 15.09.2022 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514818863 | 05.08.2015 | |||
US201514973465 | 17.12.2015 | |||
US201514665648 | 23.03.2015 | |||
US201461990027 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201916263707 | 31.01.2019 | |||
US201414320184 | 30.06.2014 | |||
US201615288152 | 07.10.2016 | |||
US202016929690 | 15.07.2020 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
US202217588507 | 31.01.2022 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2022117883 | ![]() | 21.04.2022 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US202117355607 | 23.06.2021 | |||
US201916460046 | 02.07.2019 | |||
US202016951604 | 18.11.2020 | |||
US201514889727 | 06.11.2015 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2021008089 | ![]() | 14.01.2021 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514818863 | 05.08.2015 | |||
US201514973465 | 17.12.2015 | |||
US201514665648 | 23.03.2015 | |||
US201461990027 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201916263707 | 31.01.2019 | |||
US201414320184 | 30.06.2014 | |||
US201615288152 | 07.10.2016 | |||
US202016929690 | 15.07.2020 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2017020905 | ![]() | 26.01.2017 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514818863 | 05.08.2015 | |||
US201514973465 | 17.12.2015 | |||
US201514665648 | 23.03.2015 | |||
US201461990027 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201414320184 | 30.06.2014 | |||
US201615288152 | 07.10.2016 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US2016101122 | ![]() | 14.04.2016 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514818863 | 05.08.2015 | |||
US201514973465 | 17.12.2015 | |||
US201514665648 | 23.03.2015 | |||
US201461990027 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201414320184 | 30.06.2014 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9572825 | ![]() | 21.02.2017 | B2 | |
US2016022716 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514818863 | 05.08.2015 | |||
US201514665648 | 23.03.2015 | |||
US201461990027 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201414320184 | 30.06.2014 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9125924 | ![]() | 08.09.2015 | B2 | |
US2015196575 | 16.07.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514665648 | 23.03.2015 | |||
US201461990027 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201414320184 | 30.06.2014 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9084720 | ![]() | 21.07.2015 | B2 | |
US2014336145 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201461990027 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201414320184 | 30.06.2014 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US12239733 | ![]() | 04.03.2025 | B2 | |
US2024009113 | 11.01.2024 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US202117355607 | 23.06.2021 | |||
US201916460046 | 02.07.2019 | |||
US202016951604 | 18.11.2020 | |||
US202318131161 | 05.04.2023 | |||
US201514889727 | 06.11.2015 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10869831 | ![]() | 22.12.2020 | B2 | |
US2019374463 | 12.12.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201916460046 | 02.07.2019 | |||
US201514889727 | 06.11.2015 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10751353 | ![]() | 25.08.2020 | B2 | |
US2019336518 | 07.11.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201514818863 | 05.08.2015 | |||
US201514973465 | 17.12.2015 | |||
US201514665648 | 23.03.2015 | |||
US201461990027 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201916263707 | 31.01.2019 | |||
US201414320184 | 30.06.2014 | |||
US201615288152 | 07.10.2016 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10493023 | ![]() | 03.12.2019 | B2 | |
US2016120798 | 05.05.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201414889727 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR20160009617 | ![]() | 26.01.2016 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2023040211 | ![]() | 22.03.2023 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
JP2019075517 | 11.04.2019 | |||
JP2021095562 | 08.06.2021 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2021152032 | ![]() | 30.09.2021 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
JP2019075517 | 11.04.2019 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6837835B | ![]() | 03.03.2021 | B2 | |
JP2016518403 | 23.06.2016 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL241757 | ![]() | 31.05.2020 | B | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP4218769 | ![]() | 18.10.2023 | A3 | |
EP4218769 | 02.08.2023 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
EP14733380 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2025201824 | ![]() | 03.04.2025 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2025201824 | 13.03.2025 | |||
AU2014264228 | 07.05.2014 | |||
AU2023200303 | 20.01.2023 | |||
AU2020277197 | 26.11.2020 | |||
AU2019204513 | 26.06.2019 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2023200303 | ![]() | 23.02.2023 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2014264228 | 07.05.2014 | |||
AU2023200303 | 20.01.2023 | |||
AU2020277197 | 26.11.2020 | |||
AU2019204513 | 26.06.2019 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2020277197 | ![]() | 24.12.2020 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2014264228 | 07.05.2014 | |||
AU2020277197 | 26.11.2020 | |||
AU2019204513 | 26.06.2019 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2019204513B | ![]() | 10.09.2020 | B2 | |
AU2019204513 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
AU2014264228 | 07.05.2014 | |||
AU2019204513 | 26.06.2019 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2014264228 | ![]() | 12.11.2015 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP2994145 | ![]() | 04.01.2023 | B1 | |
EP2994145 | 16.03.2016 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA2911399 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA3239805 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
CA2911399 | 07.05.2014 | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CR20150637 | 05.04.2016 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EA201501054 | 29.04.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
HK1217300 | 06.01.2017 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
MD20150120 | 31.03.2016 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
MX2015015355 | 18.07.2016 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
SG11201509030T | 27.11.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
WO2014IL50411 | 07.05.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2014181333 | ![]() | 08.01.2015 | A3 | |
WO2014181333 | 13.11.2014 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2019142907 | ![]() | 29.08.2019 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PE20160012 | 14.02.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201361820278 | 07.05.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
EP4218769 |