|
08.09.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.09.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Information about non-relevance of third-party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
12.08.2020 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2020 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.08.2020 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.08.2020 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.08.2020 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.08.2020 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.07.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
28.07.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
27.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
29 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |