Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8839396 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2014 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201313897333 | 17.05.2013 | US201314103736 | 11.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2912774 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2019 | C | CA2912774 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313897333 | 17.05.2013 | WO2014US38272 | 15.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2997711 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2019 | B1 | EP2997711 | 23.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313897333 | 17.05.2013 | WO2014US38272 | 15.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014186627 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313897333 | 17.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8613069 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2013 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201313897333 | 17.05.2013 |