|
21.12.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
141 |
|
26.11.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
141 |
|
09.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
141 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
141 |
|
19.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
170 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
180 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
171 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.10.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.10.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
28 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
89 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
52 |