EP3158381 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING AN OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newson N.V. Burg. de Lausnaystraat 63 9290 Overmere-Berlare / BE | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BIESEN, Marc Burgemeester de Lausnaystraat 63 B-9290 Berlare / BE | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [2023/23] |
Former [2017/17] | Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | Application number, filing date | 14734066.5 | 20.06.2014 | [2017/17] | WO2014EP63082 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015192914 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158381 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3158381 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/182, G02B26/08, G02B26/10 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
G02B7/1828 (EP,US);
G02B26/08 (US);
G01D5/20 (US);
G02B26/0816 (EP,US);
G02B26/101 (EP,US);
G02B7/1827 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES OPTISCHEN NETZWERKS | [2017/17] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING AN OPTICAL ELEMENT | [2017/17] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT D'ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 11.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2021/01] | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 20.06.2023 | GB | 07.09.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IE | 20.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [ID]US6188502 (AOKI KAZUHIKO [JP]) [ID] 1,5,6,10 * column 6, line 29 - column 7, line 62 * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]US8665500 (OSIPCHUK YURI VLADIMIROVICH [US]) [I] 1,5,6,10 * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 64 * * inductive proximity sensor; column 6, paragraph 2 ** figures 1,2 * | Examination | US4157861 | US2006064884 | WO2009106094 | US8665500 |