EP3014299 - SIGNAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qinetiq Limited Cody Technology Park Ively Road Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Nigel Clement QinetiQ Ltd. Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | 02 /
BOWDEN, Richard Edward QinetiQ Ltd. Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | 03 /
DUMVILLE, Mark Nottingham Scientific Ltd. Loxley House Tottle Road Riverside Business Park Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG2 1RT / GB | 04 /
WALES, Ben Peter Nottingham Scientific Ltd. Loxley House Tottle Road Riverside Business Park Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG2 1RT / GB | 05 /
AGUADO, Luis Enrique Nottingham Scientific Ltd. Loxley House Tottle Road Riverside Business Park Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG2 1RT / GB | 06 /
EVANS, Thomas Andrew QinetiQ Ltd. Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | QINETIQ IP QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern, Worcestershire, WR14 3PS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Loughrey, Paul Francis QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Department St. Andrews Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14734131.7 | 27.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014EP63743 | Priority number, date | GB20130011571 | 27.06.2013 Original published format: GB 201311571 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014207223 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3014299 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/21, G01S19/09, G01S19/32 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
G01S19/32 (EP,RU,US);
G01S19/09 (EP,RU,US);
G01S19/215 (EP,RU,US);
G01S19/05 (US);
H04B7/18523 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNG | [2016/18] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING | [2016/18] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 26.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5825887 (LENNEN GARY R [US]); | [XI]US2005038601 (DENTINGER MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [I]US2012121087 (PSIAKI MARK L [US]); |