Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2913409 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2020 | C | CA2913409 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870200 | 25.04.2013 | WO2014US35062 | 23.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2994682 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2018 | B1 | EP2994682 | 16.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870200 | 25.04.2013 | WO2014US35062 | 23.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014176299 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870200 | 25.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014319826 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313870200 | 25.04.2013 |