EP3008510 - METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A MEASURED CONTOUR OF A SPECTACLE FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [2018/02] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Essilor International (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURADORE, Fabien C/O Essilor International 147 rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton-le-pont / FR | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Novitech 188 Grande rue Charles de Gaulle 94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14734758.7 | 13.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014EP62367 | Priority number, date | EP20130305797 | 13.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13305797 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014198888 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008510 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02, G02C13/00 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G02C7/028 (EP,US);
G02C13/003 (EP,US);
G02C13/005 (US);
G02C7/024 (EP,US);
G02C7/027 (US);
G02C7/066 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINER GEMESSENEN KONTUR EINES BRILLENGESTELLS | [2016/16] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A MEASURED CONTOUR OF A SPECTACLE FRAME | [2016/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION D'UN CONTOUR MESURÉ D'UNE MONTURE DE LUNETTES | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 23.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0052517 (SHAMIR OPTICAL INDUSTRY [IL], et al) [A] 6-12 * claims 10-31 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 12 * * page 13, line 3 - line 20 ** page 17, line 18 - line 21 *; | [A]EP2028529 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [A] 6-12 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [ 0016] , [ 0020] - [0023] - [ 0070] - [0073] - [ 0075] - [0077]; figures 6-9 * * paragraphs [0081] - [0083] - [ 0088] , [ 0100] - [0111] - [ 0113] - [0115] *; | [I]EP2031435 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] - [ 0019] - [0021] - [ 0044] , [ 0048] - [0055] - [ 0058] - [0059] * * paragraph [0065] *; | [I]EP2305424 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [I] 1-5,13,14 * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0010] , [ 0012] , [ 0017] , [ 0044] , [ 0045] , [ 0178] *; | [A]WO2012008975 (ZEISS CARL VISION INC [US], et al) [A] 6-12 * page 5, line 5 - line 17 * * page 14, line 21 - page 16, line 22 *; | [A] - JIGUO CAO ET AL, "Estimating curves and derivatives with parametric penalized spline smoothing", STATISTICS AND COMPUTING, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20110923), vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S11222-011-9278-4, ISSN 1573-1375, pages 1059 - 1067, XP035079728 [A] 1,6 * abstract * * page 1060, column Right - page 1061, column Left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11222-011-9278-4 |