EP2941716 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING A RENAT COMMUNICATIONS ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E^NAT Technologies, LLC 1520 S. Arlington St. Akron, OH 44306 / US | [2021/15] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Skycasters, LLC 1520 South Arlington Street Akron, OH 44306 / US | ||
Former [2015/46] | For all designated states Accelaration Systems, LLC 5001 Jennie Kate Lane Lexington, KY 40510 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKINNEY, Jack, Dennis 5001 Jennine Kate Lane Lexington, KY 40510 / US | 02 /
MCKINNEY, Richard Lee 530 North Street Sw Apartment S305 Washington, DC 20024 / US | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | ||
Former [2015/46] | Portch, Daniel Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14735319.7 | 02.01.2014 | [2015/46] | WO2014US10023 | Priority number, date | US201361748248P | 02.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361748248 P | [2015/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014107482 | Date: | 10.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941716 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2941716 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H04L61/2525 (EP,RU,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,RU,US);
H04L45/741 (RU,US);
H04L45/745 (EP,RU,US);
H04L61/2514 (EP,US);
H04L61/2592 (EP,US);
H04L61/5007 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/46] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER RENAT-KOMMUNIKATIONSUMGEBUNG | [2015/46] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING A RENAT COMMUNICATIONS ENVIRONMENT | [2015/46] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE COMMUNICATION RENAT | [2015/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 16.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 17.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 27.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20191949.5 / EP3779712 | EP21187981.2 / EP3920514 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 19.10.2017 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2019/34] | 04.11.2019 | Resumption of proceedings | [2019/34] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.01.2014 | AL | 26.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | DK | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | FI | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | PL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | TR | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | IE | 02.01.2021 | LU | 02.01.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.01.2014 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.01.2021 | ||
LU | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 02.01.2014 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.01.2021 | ||
LU | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 02.01.2014 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.01.2021 | ||
LU | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.01.2021 | ||
LU | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 26.08.2020 | |
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003145104 (BODEN EDWARD B [US], et al); | [X]US7814541 (MANVI RAJENDRA [US]); | International search | [Y]US2006225130 (CHEN KAI [US], et al); | [Y]US2007180142 (SMALL KEITH M [CA], et al); | [Y]US2008201486 (HSU NAI-TING [US], et al); | [Y]US2011252146 (SANTAMARIA JUSTIN [US], et al); | [Y]US2012005476 (WEI YIN [US], et al); | [A]US2012179831 (BROUSSEAU WILLIAM REYNOLDS [US], et al); | [Y]US2012317252 (VEMULAPALLI JYOTHI [IN], et al) | by applicant | US2003145104 | US7814541 |