EP2941710 - CONTROL MODULE AND CABLES FOR NETWORKING ELECTRICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keller, Walter 717 Murphy Rd. Medford, OR 97504 / US | [2015/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Grau, Benjamin Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Grau, Benjamin Murgitroyd 165-169 Scotland Street Glawgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14735447.6 | 07.01.2014 | [2015/46] | WO2014US10534 | Priority number, date | US201361749818P | 07.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361749818 P | US201361749809P | 07.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361749809 P | [2015/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014107738 | Date: | 10.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941710 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/14, G06F13/40, G05B19/042, H04W4/00, H04L12/28 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
G05B19/042 (US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2841 (EP,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/46] | G06F13/14, G06F13/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Title | German: | STEUERMODUL UND KABEL ZUR VERNETZUNG ELEKTRISCHER VORRICHTUNGEN | [2015/46] | English: | CONTROL MODULE AND CABLES FOR NETWORKING ELECTRICAL DEVICES | [2015/46] | French: | MODULE DE COMMANDE ET CÂBLES PERMETTANT LA MISE EN RÉSEAU DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRIQUES | [2015/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2002160729 (PATTERSON WADE C [US], et al); | [Y]US2005246408 (CHUNG HAU LEUNG S [CN]); | [A]WO2008115256 (CONSERVE LLC I [US], et al); | [A]US7526539 (HSU GEORGE [US]); | [X]US2009154933 (MORTENSEN PETER [US]) |