EP3017470 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A LEAD WITH SELECTIVELY MODIFIED ELECTRICAL PROPERTIES AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/19] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A LEAD WITH SELECTIVELY MODIFIED ELECTRICAL PROPERTIES | ||
[2018/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosenberger Hochfrequenztechnik GmbH & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 83413 Fridolfing / DE | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAHILL, Sean S. 3350 Thomas Road Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
SANJUAN, Eric A. 3350 Thomas Road Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 02 37 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14735474.0 | 02.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014EP01824 | Priority number, date | US201361842945P | 03.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361842945 P | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015000595 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017470 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3017470 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L23/49, H01L23/66, // H01L23/50 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01L23/49541 (US);
H01L21/4821 (US);
H01L21/4846 (US);
H01L23/49506 (US);
H01L23/49827 (US);
H01L23/49838 (EP,US);
H01L23/64 (EP,US);
H01L23/645 (US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/85 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6611 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45541 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4555 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4556 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45565 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4569 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48011 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4903 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49052 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85444 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8592 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8593 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85931 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85935 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85939 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85947 (EP,US);
H01L23/50 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30111 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48011, H01L2924/20654 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2016/19] | H01L23/49, H01L23/50, H01L23/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT LEITUNG MIT SELEKTIV MODIFIZIERTEN ELEKTRISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2018/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A LEAD WITH SELECTIVELY MODIFIED ELECTRICAL PROPERTIES AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2018/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE AYANT UN CONDUCTEUR À PROPRIÉTÉS ÉLECTRIQUES SÉLECTIVEMENT MODIFIÉES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/18] |
Former [2016/19] | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT LEITUNG MIT SELEKTIV MODIFIZIERTEN ELEKTRISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | ||
Former [2016/19] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A LEAD WITH SELECTIVELY MODIFIED ELECTRICAL PROPERTIES | ||
Former [2016/19] | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE AYANT UN CONDUCTEUR À PROPRIÉTÉS ÉLECTRIQUES SÉLECTIVEMENT MODIFIÉES | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 18.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2014 | AL | 24.10.2018 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | HR | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MK | 24.10.2018 | MT | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | RS | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | SM | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | NO | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | IE | 02.07.2019 | LU | 02.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 02.07.2014 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
MT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.07.2019 | ||
LU | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.07.2014 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.07.2019 | ||
LU | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.07.2019 | ||
LU | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.07.2019 | ||
LU | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 02.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004089929 (CHIU CHI-TSUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1,4,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0016] , [0023] - [0033] - [0036]; figures 2,4 *; | [X]US7202109 (ZAKHARIAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12-14 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 67; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US2008296780 (YOO CHEOL-JOON [KR]) [X] 1,2,8,9,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0037] - [0043] - [0053] , [0054] , [0061] , [0062]; figures 1,7,11,12,24; claims 16-20 *; | [XD]US2009159320 (SANJUAN ERIC A [US], et al) [XD] 1,4,10,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0047] - [0053]; figures 6,14,16 *; | [X]US2010025864 (BAILEY MARK J [US], et al) [X] 1,4,13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0014] - [0021] - [0025]; figures 1-3,5; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US8377749 (PATTERSON JOSEPH MARTIN [US]) [X] 1,4,13 * column 1, line 5 - line 10; figures 2a,3,4,5 ** column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 60 *; | [X]TW201316477 (ADL ENGINEERING INC [TW]) [X] 1,4,9,11,13 * cf. figures 1 and 2 in conjunction the corresponding text;; figures 1,2,3, 5 * |