EP3017041 - N-TERMINALLY TRUNCATED GLYCOSYLTRANSFERASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2019/45] |
Former [2016/19] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZABANY, Tibor Jakob-Schefzik-Gasse 37/3 3430 Tulln an der Donau / AT | 02 /
ENGEL, Alfred Fischerried 13 82362 Weilheim / DE | 03 /
GREIF, Michael Ahornstrasse 92 82377 Penzberg / DE | 04 /
JUNG, Christine Staltacherstrasse 57B 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | 05 /
LULEY, Christiane Giginweg 60 A-8063 Hoef-Praebach / AT | 06 /
MALIK, Sebastian Hauptstrasse 15a 82387 Antdorf / DE | 07 /
MUELLER, Rainer An der Freiheit 54 82377 Penzberg / DE | 08 /
NIDETZKY, Bernd Carnerigasse 10 A-8010 Graz / AT | 09 /
RIBITSCH, Doris Otto Loewigasse 12/8 A-8042 Graz / AT | 10 /
SCHMOELZER, Katharina Kossgasse 11A A-8010 Graz / AT | 11 /
SCHWAB, Helmut Mariagruenerstrasse 91 A-8043 Graz / AT | 12 /
SOBEK, Harald Dinglingerstrasse 10/3 88400 Biberach / DE | 13 /
SUPPMANN, Bernhard An der Baerenmuehle 4 82362 Weilheim / DE | 14 /
THOMANN, Marco Loisachweg 1a 82547 Beuerberg / DE | 15 /
ZITZENBACHER, Sabine Stiftingtalstrasse 56A/1 A-8010 Graz / AT | [2019/38] |
Former [2016/21] | 01 /
CZABANY, Tibor Jakob-Schefzik-Gasse 37/3 3430 Tulln an der Donau / AT | ||
02 /
ENGEL, Alfred Fischerried 13 82362 Weilheim / DE | |||
03 /
GREIF, Michael An der Freiheit 99 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
04 /
JUNG, Christine Staltacherstrasse 57B 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | |||
05 /
LULEY, Christiane Giginweg 60 A-8063 Hoef-Praebach / AT | |||
06 /
MALIK, Sebastian Hauptstrasse 15a 82387 Antdorf / DE | |||
07 /
MUELLER, Rainer An der Freiheit 54 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
08 /
NIDETZKY, Bernd Carnerigasse 10 A-8010 Graz / AT | |||
09 /
RIBITSCH, Doris Otto Loewigasse 12/8 A-8042 Graz / AT | |||
10 /
SCHMOELZER, Katharina Kossgasse 11A A-8010 Graz / AT | |||
11 /
SCHWAB, Helmut Mariagruenerstrasse 91 A-8043 Graz / AT | |||
12 /
SOBEK, Harald Dinglingerstrasse 10/3 88400 Biberach / DE | |||
13 /
SUPPMANN, Bernhard An der Baerenmuehle 4 82362 Weilheim / DE | |||
14 /
THOMANN, Marco Westend 4 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
15 /
ZITZENBACHER, Sabine Stiftingtalstrasse 56A/1 A-8010 Graz / AT | |||
Former [2016/19] | 01 /
CZABANY, Tibor Grafenbergstrasse 53 A-8010 Graz / AT | ||
02 /
ENGEL, Alfred Fischerried 13 82362 Weilheim / DE | |||
03 /
GREIF, Michael An der Freiheit 99 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
04 /
JUNG, Christine Staltacherstrasse 57B 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | |||
05 /
LULEY, Christiane Giginweg 60 A-8063 Hoef-Praebach / AT | |||
06 /
MALIK, Sebastian Hauptstrasse 15a 82387 Antdorf / DE | |||
07 /
MUELLER, Rainer An der Freiheit 54 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
08 /
NIDETZKY, Bernd Carnerigasse 10 A-8010 Graz / AT | |||
09 /
RIBITSCH, Doris Otto Loewigasse 12/8 A-8042 Graz / AT | |||
10 /
SCHMOELZER, Katharina Kossgasse 11A A-8010 Graz / AT | |||
11 /
SCHWAB, Helmut Mariagruenerstrasse 91 A-8043 Graz / AT | |||
12 /
SOBEK, Harald Dinglingerstrasse 10/3 88400 Biberach / DE | |||
13 /
SUPPMANN, Bernhard An der Baerenmuehle 4 82362 Weilheim / DE | |||
14 /
THOMANN, Marco Westend 4 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
15 /
ZITZENBACHER, Sabine Stiftingtalstrasse 56A/1 A-8010 Graz / AT | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2019/45] |
Former [2016/19] | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14735569.7 | 03.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014EP64214 | Priority number, date | EP20130175349 | 05.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13175349 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015001034 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017041 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3017041 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
C12N9/1081 (EP,US);
C12N9/1048 (EP,US);
C12Y204/99001 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-TERMINAL VERKÜRZTE GLYKOSYLTRANSFERASEN | [2017/45] | English: | N-TERMINALLY TRUNCATED GLYCOSYLTRANSFERASES | [2016/19] | French: | GLYCOSYLTRANSFÉRASES TRONQUÉS À L'EXTRÉMITÉ N | [2017/45] |
Former [2016/19] | N-TERMINAL TRUNKIERTE GLYKOSYLTRANSFERASEN | ||
Former [2016/19] | GLYCOSYLTRANSFÉRASES TRONQUÉES À L'EXTRÉMITÉ N-TERMINALE | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 14.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.09.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 11.06.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2017 | Decision despatched | 14.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2014 | AL | 06.11.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | GB | 03.07.2020 | IE | 03.07.2020 | LU | 03.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | FR | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.07.2014 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
GB | 03.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
GB | 03.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
GB | 03.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
IE | 03.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007135194 (UNIV PROVENCE AIX MARSEILLE 1 [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim 8 * * sequence 44 *; | [XAI] - SHINOBU KITAZUME-KAWAGUCHI ET AL, "The relationship between ST6Gal I Golgi retention and its cleavage-secretion", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (19990101), vol. 9, pages 1397 - 1406, XP055087331 [X] 1-4 * page 1399, column r - page 1400, column l, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * * page 1402, column r, paragraph 1 * [A] 6-17 [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/oxfordjournals.glycob.a018856 | [XA] - SANDRINE DONADIO ET AL, "Recognition of cell surface acceptors by two human [alpha]-2,6-sialyltransferases produced in CHO cells", BIOCHIMIE, (20030301), vol. 85, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/S0300-9084(03)00080-4, ISSN 0300-9084, pages 311 - 321, XP055087254 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 314, column r, paragraph 1 - page 317, column l, line 2 * * figure 1 * * page 319, column r, paragraph 1 * [A] 6-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-9084(03)00080-4 | [XA] - LEGAIGNEUR P ET AL, "Exploring the acceptor substrate recognition of the human beta-Galactoside alpha2,6-sialyltransferase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20010615), vol. 276, no. 24, doi:10.1074/JBC.M100860200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21608 - 21617, XP002326446 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * Scheme 1; page 21609 * * page 21612, column r, paragraph l - page 21613, paragraph 2 * [A] 6-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M100860200 | [A] - "Human ST6Gal I CD domain c-terminal minimal fragment SEQ ID NO:44.", Geneseq, (20080124), Database accession no. AOD33468, URL: EBI, XP002716151 [A] 1-17 * abstract * | Examination | - CHEN CHUN ET AL, "Minimal structural and glycosylation requirements for ST6Gal I activity and trafficking", GLYCOBIOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (20000501), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.1093/GLYCOB/10.5.531, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 531 - 583, XP002467896 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/10.5.531 | by applicant | US5032519 | - PATEL RY ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 16, pages 108 - 116 | - DALLOLIO F., GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, (2000), vol. 17, pages 669 - 676 | - DONADIO S. ET AL., BIOCHIMIE, (2003), vol. 85, pages 311 - 321 | - STADTMAN, "Selenocysteine", ANNU REV BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 65, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.bi.65.070196.000503, pages 83 - 100, XP002925830 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.bi.65.070196.000503 | - IBBA ET AL., "Genetic code: introducing pyrrolysine", CURR BIOL., (2002), vol. 12, no. 13, pages R464 - R466 | - ZHANG ET AL., "Selective incorporation of 5-hydroxytryptophan into proteins in mammalian cells", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2004), vol. 101, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0307029101, pages 8882 - 8887, XP002435941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0307029101 | - ANDERSON ET AL., "An expanded genetic code with a functional quadruplet codon", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2004), vol. 101, no. 20, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0401517101, pages 7566 - 7571, XP055227944 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0401517101 | - IKEDA ET AL., "Synthesis of a novel histidine analogue and its efficient incorporation into a protein in vivo", PROTEIN ENG. DES. SEL., (2003), vol. 16, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1093/protein/gzg084, pages 699 - 706, XP002982482 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/gzg084 | - CHIN ET AL., "An Expanded Eukaryotic Genetic Code", SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 301, no. 5635, pages 964 - 967, XP002405596 | - JAMES ET AL., "Kinetic characterization of ribonuclease S mutants containing photoisomerizable phenylazophenylalanine residues", PROTEIN ENG. DES. SEL., (2001), vol. 14, no. 12, pages 983 - 991 | - KOHRER ET AL., "Import of amber and ochre suppressor tRNAs into mammalian cells: A general approach to site-specific insertion of amino acid analogues into proteins", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2001), vol. 98, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.251438898, pages 14310 - 14315, XP002296505 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.251438898 | - BACHER ET AL., "Selection and Characterization of Escherichia coli Variants Capable of Growth on an Otherwise Toxic Tryptophan Analogue", J. BACTERIOL., (2001), vol. 183, no. 18, pages 5414 - 5425 | - HAMANO-TAKAKU ET AL., "A Mutant Escherichia coli Tyrosyl-tRNA Synthetase Utilizes the Unnatural Amino Acid Azatyrosine More Efficiently than Tyrosine", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, no. 51, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M003696200, pages 40324 - 40328, XP002950537 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M003696200 | - BUDISA ET AL., "Proteins with {beta}-(thienopyrrolyl)alanines as alternative chromophores and pharmaceutically active amino acids", PROTEIN SCI., (2001), vol. 10, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1110/ps.51601, pages 1281 - 1292, XP008009390 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/ps.51601 | - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - BARB ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 48, pages 9705 - 9707 | - BORK K. ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (2009), vol. 98, pages 3499 - 3508 | - MALISSARD ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2000), vol. 267, pages 169 - 171 | - OGATA M. ET AL., BMC BIOTECHNOL., (2009), vol. 9, page 54 | - HIDARI ET AL., GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, (2005), vol. 22, pages 1 - 11 | - CHEN C; COLLEY K.J., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 10, pages 531 - 538 | - LEGAIGNEUR ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 21608 - 21617 | - LEGAIGNEUR ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 21608 - 17 | - ALTSCHUL S.F. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - BACKLIWAL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 36, page E96 |