EP3008640 - INFORMATION FILTERING AT USER DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAITHILINGAM, Ram c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14736096.0 | 30.05.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014US40113 | Priority number, date | US201313914624 | 11.06.2013 Original published format: US201313914624 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014200711 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008640 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06Q30/02 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0256 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSFILTERUNG AUF BENUTZERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/16] | English: | INFORMATION FILTERING AT USER DEVICES | [2016/16] | French: | FILTRAGE D'INFORMATIONS SUR DES DISPOSITIFS UTILISATEURS | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 29.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1647903 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0 17] , [0 19] , [0 26] - [0028] - [0030] , [0035] , [0036] , [0038]; figure 1 * [I] 3-8; | [I]US2012084248 (GAVRILESCU ALEXANDRU [US]) [I] 1-10* paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0016] , [0019] , [0023] , [0024] , [0032] - [0034] - [0042] - [0048] - [0051] , [0061] , [0062]; figures 4,5 *; | [XI]US2012089584 (YOON YEO CHAN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0026] - [0031] - [0044] , [0048] , [0050] - [0055] - [0064] - [0066] - [0071] - [0074] - [0078] , [0080] , [0083] , [0085] , [0093] , [0094]; figures 2-4 * [I] 3-8 |