|
03.09.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
152 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
138 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
100 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
31 |