EP3019217 - AUTOINJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEMP, Thomas The Mill Mill Steet Ashwell Hertfordshire SG7 5LU / GB | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Finger, Catrin Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10/11 99096 Erfurt / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2016/20] | Finger, Catrin Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10-11 99096 Erfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 14736783.3 | 07.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014EP64423 | Priority number, date | EP20130175660 | 09.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13175660 | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015004048 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3019217 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3019217 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/32 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
A61M5/3204 (EP,US);
A61M5/326 (EP,US);
A61M5/2033 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2013 (EP,US);
A61M2005/206 (EP,US);
A61M2005/208 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3247 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Extension states | BA | 23.12.2015 | ME | 23.12.2015 | Title | German: | AUTOINJEKTOR | [2016/20] | English: | AUTOINJECTOR | [2016/20] | French: | AUTO-INJECTEUR | [2016/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 16.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18189942.8 / EP3434302 | EP22156678.9 / EP4056212 | EP24197383.3 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2014 | AL | 19.09.2018 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | ES | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.07.2014 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.07.2014 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2009063030 (SHL GROUP AB [SE], et al); | [I]EP2438942 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [I]EP2489380 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [I]WO2013034984 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) |