|
16.10.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
27.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2015 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
256 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
240 |