EP2943578 - DNAZYME FOR SILENCING THE EXPRESSION OF EGFR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Taiwan University No. 1, Sec.4, Roosevelt Road Taipei 10617 / TW | For all designated states Academia Sinica 128, Sec. 2 Academia Sinica Road Nan-Kang Taipei 115 / TW | [2019/15] |
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states National Taiwan University No. 1, Sec.4, Roosevelt Road Taipei 10617 / TW | ||
For all designated states Academia Sinica 128 Academia Road Section 2 Nankang, Taipei, 115 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Pan-chyr 1 Jen-Ai Road Section 1 Taipei 10051 / TW | 02 /
LAI, Wei-Yun 128 Academia Road Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115 / TW | 03 /
PECK, Konan "-" "deceased" / TW | 04 /
CHANG, Cheng-Ju 128, ACADEMIA ROAD, Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115, Taiwan / TW | 05 /
CHEN, Chi-Yuan 128, ACADEMIA ROAD, Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115, Taiwan / TW | 06 /
YANG, Shuenn-Chen 128, ACADEMIA ROAD, Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115, Taiwan / TW | [2019/15] |
Former [2017/46] | 01 /
YANG, Pan-chyr 1 Jen-Ai Road Section 1 Taipei 10051 / TW | ||
02 /
LAI, Wei-Yun 128 Academia Road Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115 / TW | |||
03 /
PECK, Konan "-" "deceased" / TW | |||
04 /
CHANG, Cheng-Ju 128, ACADEMIA ROAD, Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115, Taiwan / CN | |||
05 /
CHEN, Chi-Yuan 128, ACADEMIA ROAD, Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115, Taiwan / CN | |||
06 /
YANG, Shuenn-Chen 128, ACADEMIA ROAD, Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115, Taiwan / CN | |||
Former [2015/47] | 01 /
YANG, Pan-chyr 1 Jen-Ai Road Section 1 Taipei 10051 / TW | ||
02 /
LAI, Wei-Yun 128 Academia Road Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115 / TW | |||
03 /
PECK, Konan 128 Academia Road, Section 2, Nankang Taipei 115 Taiwan Province of China / TW | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/47] | Tischner, Oliver, et al Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14737655.2 | 14.01.2014 | [2015/47] | WO2014US11496 | Priority number, date | US201361752117P | 14.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361752117 P | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014110577 | Date: | 17.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2943578 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2943578 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/713, C12N15/113 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/485 (EP,US);
C12N2310/127 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/33 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | C12P19/34, C12N9/00, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DNAZYM ZUM AUSSCHALTEN DER EXPRESSION VON EGFR | [2015/47] | English: | DNAZYME FOR SILENCING THE EXPRESSION OF EGFR | [2015/47] | French: | ADN À ACTIVITÉ CATALYTIQUE SERVANT À SUPPRIMER L'EXPRESSION DE L'EGFR | [2015/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 03.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2014 | AL | 10.04.2019 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | IT | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.01.2014 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2012043633 (NAT CT NEUROLOGY & PSYCHIATRY [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,15,16 * figure 22; example 4 * [I] 1-4,7-23; | [P]EP2623600 (NAT CT NEUROLOGY & PSYCHIATRY [JP]) [P] * page 32, paragraph 172 - page 33, paragraph 177; figure 22; example 4; table 8 *; | [XI] - CHEN GANG ET AL, "Effect of siRNAs targeting the EGFR T790M mutation in a non-small cell lung cancer cell line resistant to EGFR tyrosine kinase inhibitors and combination with various agents", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20121222), vol. 431, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2012.12.070, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 623 - 629, XP028980106 [X] 1,2,15,16 * the whole document * [I] 1,2,7-15,17-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2012.12.070 | [I] - GANG CHEN ET AL, "Targeting the epidermal growth factor receptor in non-small cell lung cancer cells: the effect of combining RNA interference with tyrosine kinase inhibitors or cetuximab", BMC MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20120321), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1741-7015-10-28, ISSN 1741-7015, page 28, XP021123822 [I] 1,2,7-15,17-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1741-7015-10-28 | [T] - WEI-YUN LAI ET AL, "Overcoming EGFR T790M-based Tyrosine Kinase Inhibitor Resistance with an Allele-specific DNAzyme", MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, (20140304), vol. 3, no. 3, doi:10.1038/mtna.2014.3, page e150, XP055286687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2014.3 | [A] - ZHANG SHUANG ET AL, "Suppression of Epidermal Growth Factor Receptor (EGFR) Expression by Small Hairpin RNA Inhibits the Growth of Human Nonsmall Cell Lung Cancers Bearing Wild-type and Mutant EGFR", CANCER INVESTIGATION,, (20110101), vol. 29, no. 10, ISSN 0735-7907, pages 701 - 708, XP008180787 [A] 1,2,7-23 | [A] - BEALE G ET AL, "GENE SILENCING NUCLEIC ACIDS DESIGNED BY SCANNING ARRAYS: ANTI-EGFR ACTIVITY OF SIRNA, RIBOZYME AND DNA ENZYMES TARGETING A SINGLE HYBRIDIZATION-ACCESSIBLE REGION USING THE SAME DELIVERY SYSTEM", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH, DE, (20030801), vol. 11, no. 7, doi:10.1080/1061186042000207039, ISSN 1061-186X, pages 449 - 456, XP009034373 [A] 1,2,7-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/1061186042000207039 | International search | [Y]US2011275072 (SESHAGIRI SOMASEKAR [US]); | [Y]US2007048754 (FREEMAN DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2007020621 (BOUKHAROV ANDREY A [US], et al); | [A]US2004031072 (LA ROSA THOMAS J [US], et al); | [A]EP1767632 (SIRNA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [Y] - CASSELL, A ET AL., "Investigational EGFR-Targeted Therapies In HNSCC.", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS., (20100601), vol. 19, no. 6, doi:10.1517/13543781003769844, pages 709 - 722, XP055266140 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543781003769844 | [Y] - YU , SH ET AL., "Specific Repression Of Mutant K-RAS By 10-23 DNAzyme: Sensitizing Cancer Cell To Anti-Cancer Therapies .", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS., (20090109), vol. 378, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2008.11.027, pages 230 - 234, XP025745435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2008.11.027 | [Y] - SHARMA , SV ET AL., "Epidermal Growth Gactor Receptor Mutations In Lung Cancer.", NATURE REVIEWS, (20070301), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/NRC2088, pages 169 - 181, XP002556732 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc2088 | [Y] - GLEAVE, M ET AL., "Progression To Androgen Independence Is Delayed By Adjuvant Treatment With Antisense Bcl-2 Oligodeoxynucleotides After Castration In The LNCaP Prostate Tumor Model.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (19991001), vol. 8, pages 2891 - 2898, XP055266292 | [A] - MAUCELI, E ET AL., "Culex Quinquefasciatus Calmodulin-Binding Transcription Activator,mRNA.", (20070326), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://http://http://www.ncbi.nim.nih.gov/nucleotide/170035313?report=genbank&log$=nuclalign&blaSuank=38&R.ID=NNXXFI:tCK01R, (20140425), XP055270582 | Examination | WO2004038019 | - KIM JI EUN ET AL, "Site-specific cleavage of mutantABLmRNA by DNAzyme is facilitated by peptide nucleic acid binding to RNA substrate", FEBS LETTERS, (20120923), vol. 586, no. 21, doi:10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2012.09.013, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 3865 - 3869, XP028953171 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2012.09.013 | - Amr Abdelgany ET AL, "Selective DNAzyme-mediated cleavage of AChR mutant transcripts by targeting the mutation site or through mismatches in the binding arm", Journal of RNAi and gene silencing : an international journal of RNA and gene targeting research, England, (20050101), pages 32 - 37, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2737196/pdf/jrgs-01-032.pdf, XP055428068 | - Tong-Hong Wang ET AL, "The Use of 10-23 DNAzyme to Selectively Destroy the Allele of mRNA with a Unique Purine-Pyrimidine Dinucleotide", OLIGONUCLEOTIDES., US, (20080901), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1089/oli.2008.0138, ISSN 1545-4576, pages 295 - 300, XP055428081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/oli.2008.0138 | by applicant | US2012225870 | - Journal of Drug Targeting, (20030800), vol. 11, no. 7, pages 449 - 456 | - Mol Cancer Ther, (20080000), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 243 - 51 | - SCHUBERT, S.; GUL, D.C., GRUNERT; H.P.; ZEICHHARDT, H.; ERDMANN, V.A.; KURRECK, J., "RNA cleaving '10-23' DNAzymes with enhanced stability and activity", Nucleic Acids Res, (20030000), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkg791, pages 5982 - 5992, XP002272988 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkg791 | - DASS, C.R.; CHOONG, P.F.; KHACHIGIAN, L.M., "DNAzyme technology and cancer therapy: cleave and let die", Mol Cancer Ther, (20080000), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-07-0510, pages 243 - 251, XP055174842 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-07-0510 | - BREAKER, R. R.; JOYCE, G., Chemistry and Biology, (19950000), vol. 2, no. 6, page 55 | - SANTORO; S. W. & JOYCE, G. F. Proc. Natl, Acad. Sci. USA, (19970000), vol. 94, page 4262 | - Nucleic Acids Res, vol. 36, pages 4768 - 4777 |