|
29.06.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
25.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2016 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
27.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
53 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
74 |