EP3021658 - BALER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuhn-Geldrop B.V. Nuenenseweg 165 5667 KP Geldrop / NL | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BOOMEN, Benny Petrus Lambertus Martinus Strijperstraat 20 5595 GC Leenderstrijp / NL | 02 /
VERHAEGH, Thomas Garardus Maria Antoniusplein 19D 5943 AJ Lomm / NL | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/21] | 01 /
BOOMEN VAN DEN, Benny Petrus Lambertus Martinus Strijperstraat 20 NL-5595 GC Leenderstrijp / NL | ||
02 /
VERHAEGH, Thomas Garardus Maria Antoniusplein 19D NL-5943 AJ Lomm / NL | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Raynor, Simon Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB | ||
Former [2016/21] | Raynor, Simon Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14739398.7 | 10.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014EP64876 | Priority number, date | GB20130012758 | 17.07.2013 Original published format: GB 201312758 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015007623 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021658 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3021658 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/07 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
A01F15/0715 (EP);
A01F15/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BALLENPRESSE | [2016/21] | English: | BALER | [2016/21] | French: | PRESSE À BALLES | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 30.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19194207.7 / EP3590326 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2014 | AL | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | LU | 10.07.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 10.07.2014 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.07.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]DE8912253U (CLAAS OHG [DE]) [I] 1,3,4,18,20,22-24 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2005109007 (HOOD WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-20,23,24 * paragraphs [0001] , [0023] , [0027] - [0030] - [0050] , [0051]; figures 1,2,3c,3d * [Y] 21 [I] 6; | [XY]DE102004033252 (CLAAS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [X] 1-8,18-20,22-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0027] - [0029] - [0032] , [0034] , [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0045] , [0046] * [Y] 21; | [XY]WO2011018455 (CNH BELGIUM NV [BE], et al) [X] 13,14,16-20,22-24 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0006] , [0007] , [0009] - [0016] - [0019]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 21; | [YD]WO2011067681 (KUHN GELDROP BV [NL], et al) [YD] 21 * figures 1a-6g ** page 5, lines 1-15 * |