EP3024624 - A PERSONAL CARE DEVICE AS WELL AS A CUTTING UNIT FOR SUCH A PERSONAL CARE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAGT, Johan c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN KEMPEN, Wouter c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN EIBERGEN SANTHAGENS, Robert Alexander c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
ZEINEL-DIN, Tarek c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/28] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
PRAGT, Johan c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
VAN KEMPEN, Wouter c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
VAN EIBERGEN SANTHAGENS, Robert Alexander c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
04 /
ZEINEL-DIN, Tarek c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 14739450.6 | 16.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014EP65212 | Priority number, date | EP20130177931 | 25.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13177931 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015010979 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3024624 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3024624 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/14 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
B26B19/3846 (EP,US);
B26B19/14 (EP,RU,US);
B26B19/141 (EP,US);
B26B19/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG UND SCHNEIDEINHEIT FÜR KÖRPERPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/08] | English: | A PERSONAL CARE DEVICE AS WELL AS A CUTTING UNIT FOR SUCH A PERSONAL CARE DEVICE | [2016/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOIN PERSONNEL AINSI QU'UNE UNITÉ DE COUPE POUR LEDIT DISPOSITIF | [2018/08] |
Former [2016/22] | KÖRPERPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG UND SCHNEIDEINHEIT FÜR SOLCH EINE KÖRPERPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/22] | DISPOSITIF DE SOINS PERSONNELS ET UNITÉ DE COUPE POUR UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE SOINS PERSONNELS | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2014 | AL | 11.07.2018 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | PT | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | IE | 16.07.2018 | LU | 16.07.2018 | MT | 16.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
MT | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
MT | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
MT | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]HU146204 ; | [A]US3225440 (NEAL OWENS); | [XDAI]US3889372 (SAKAI SATOSHI, et al) |