EP3019169 - HYDROXYCHLOROQUINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Botley Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [2017/10] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Botley Oxford OX2 0SZ / GB | ||
Former [2016/20] | For all designated states Isis Innovation Limited Ewert House Ewert Place Summertown, Oxford OX2 7SG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURTON, Rebecca c/o Isis innovation Ltd Ewert House Ewert Place Summertown Oxford OX2 7SG / GB | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Busher, Samantha Jane Elkington and Fife LLP 3-4 Holborn Circus London, EC1N 2HA / GB | [2016/20] | Application number, filing date | 14739537.0 | 10.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014GB52109 | Priority number, date | GB20130012386 | 10.07.2013 Original published format: GB 201312386 | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015004470 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3019169 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4706, A61K31/165, A61K31/505, A61P9/00, A61P9/12, A61P43/00 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/4706 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4706, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Title | German: | HYDROXYCHLOROQUIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KARDIOVASKULÄREN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2016/20] | English: | HYDROXYCHLOROQUINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE | [2016/20] | French: | HYDROXYCHLOROQUINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE CARDIOVASCULAIRE | [2016/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 20.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/30] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013054345 (IPCA LAB LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * abstract * * page 6, line 20 - line 28 * * claims 1,9,15 *; | [I] - DANIEL URBINE ET AL, "Hydroxychloroquine-Induced Restrictive Cardiomyopathy in a Patient With Systemic Lupus Erythematosus", CHEST, (20111023), vol. 140, no. 4_MeetingAbstracts, doi:10.1378/chest.1116752, ISSN 0012-3692, page 34A, XP055137043 [I] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1378/chest.1116752 | [I] - ZHOU JING ET AL, "Effects of low-dose hydroxychloroquine on expression of phosphorylated Akt and p53 proteins and cardiomyocyte apoptosis in peri-infarct myocardium in rats.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (201304), Database accession no. NLM23940455, XP002729005 [I] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL CARDIOLOGY SPRING 2013, (201304), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 1205-6626, pages e95 - e98, XP002729521 | [I] - P. MUTHUKRISHNAN ET AL, "Hydroxychloroquine-Induced Cardiomyopathy: A Case Report", CIRCULATION: HEART FAILURE, (20110301), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1161/CIRCHEARTFAILURE.110.959916, ISSN 1941-3289, pages e7 - e8, XP055137066 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCHEARTFAILURE.110.959916 | [I] - SAMPSON J B ET AL, "G.P.17.08 A case report of reversible hydroxychloroquine cardiomyopathy and myopathy", NEUROMUSCULAR DISORDERS, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 19, no. 8-9, ISSN 0960-8966, (20090901), pages 656 - 657, (20090730), XP026395378 [I] 1-10 * abstract * | [T] - Matt Carpenter, "Cardio Care", Isis insights, (20140101), pages 16 - 17, URL: http://www.isis-innovation.com/documents/insights75.pdf, (20140828), XP055137053 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * |