EP3033147 - POWER ARCHITECTURE FOR AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE HAVING A NON-RECHARGEABLE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMONT, Robert, G. 7635 Willis Ave. Van Nuys, CA 91405 / US | 02 /
PARRAMON, Jordi 27631 Cobblestone Court Valencia, CA 91355 / US | 03 /
OZAWA, Robert, D. 21819 Lopez Street Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/25] | Application number, filing date | 14739613.9 | 17.06.2014 | [2016/25] | WO2014US42792 | Priority number, date | US201313966510 | 14.08.2013 Original published format: US201313966510 | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015023359 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3033147 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3033147 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/378, A61N1/37, A61N1/36 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/36125 (EP);
A61N1/3708 (EP);
A61N1/3782 (EP);
A61N1/37276 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMARCHITEKTUR FÜR EINE IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT NICHT AUFLADBARER BATTERIE | [2016/25] | English: | POWER ARCHITECTURE FOR AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE HAVING A NON-RECHARGEABLE BATTERY | [2016/25] | French: | ARCHITECTURE D'ALIMENTATION POUR UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL IMPLANTABLE AYANT UNE BATTERIE NON RECHARGEABLE | [2016/25] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 14.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2014 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | LU | 17.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | FR | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.06.2014 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 23.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007097719 (PARRAMON JORDI [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] - [ 0021] - [0031] - [ 0043] - [0061] *; | [A]US2010010559 (ZHANG CHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract ** paragraphs [0015] - [0039] *; | [A]US2010211132 (NIMMAGADDA KIRAN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0013] - [ 0027] - [0045] *; | [XPL]WO2013119439 (BOSTON SCIENT NEUROMODULATION [US]) [XP] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0036]; claims 1-27 * [L] 1-19 |